EP1117359 - DECORATIVE ADHESIVE BANDAGE KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC. Grandview Road Skillman NJ 08558 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC. Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US | ||
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER PRODUCTS, INC. 199 Grandview Avenue Skillman, NJ 08558 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VESEY, Kim, Stella 204 42nd Street Manhattan Beach CA 90266 / US | [2002/01] |
Former [2001/30] | 01 /
VESEY, Kim, Stella 26-1D Bloomingdale Drive Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99950118.2 | 01.10.1999 | [2001/30] | WO1999US22963 | Priority number, date | US19980165563 | 02.10.1998 Original published format: US 165563 | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0019948 | Date: | 13.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1117359 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/00 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
A61F13/00059 (EP);
A61F13/0206 (EP);
A61F13/0226 (EP);
A61F17/00 (EP);
A61F2013/00153 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEILE FÜR DEKORATIVEN KLEBEVERBAND | [2001/30] | English: | DECORATIVE ADHESIVE BANDAGE KIT | [2001/30] | French: | KIT DE PANSEMENTS ADHESIFS DECORATIFS | [2001/30] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 27.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/10] | 24.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR1529762 (MIALON REGIS) [X] 1,3-5,7,9,11,17,24 * page 1, line 25 - line 38 * * page 1, line 59 - line 66 * * page 2, line 8 - line 15; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2217206 (WILSON JEFFREY NOBLE) [A] 1,3,4,9,21,24 * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 16 * * page 3, line 26 - line 36 * * page 4, line 15 - line 20 *; | [A]BE1009757 (LOMBARDO ANTONINO [BE]) [A] 1,17,20,24 * page 2, line 9 - line 16; figures A,B,C; claims E,F,H *; | [A]FR2425240 (NOYE MARIE CLAIRE [FR]) [A] 1,7,8,23,24 * page 1, line 1 - line 5; figures 1-8 * * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 5 *; | [A]WO9423677 (MILLS NICHOLAS JOHN [GB]) [A] 1-5,9,11,17,24 * page 5, line 15 - line 17 * * page 3, line 8 - line 9 * * page 6, line 12 - line 14 * * page 7, line 9 - page 8, line 3; figures 3A,3B,4; claims 12,28 *; | [A]DE7420413U (HERTEL INGRID) [A] 1,3,7,9,24 * figures 1-4; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US3645835 (HODGSON MARTIN E) [A] 5,11,15,18,19 * column 3, line 34 - line 37; claims 5,9,13 * | by applicant | US4094316 | US4285338 |