EP1131374 - HIGH LUSTER, FLEXIBLE MULTILAYERED FILM WITH A POLYAMIDE OUTER LAYER CONTAINING NANODISPERSED FILLING MATERIAL AND UTILIZATION OF SAID FILM FOR PACKAGING FOODSTUFFS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wipak Walsrode GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 1661 29656 Walsrode / DE | [2002/06] |
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states Wolff Walsrode AG 29655 Walsrode / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGGERS, Holger Eschenring 1a D-29664 Walsrode / DE | 02 /
KASCHEL, Gregor Uferstrasse 37 D-29699 Bomlitz / DE | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Kutzenberger, Helga, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | Kutzenberger, Helga, Dr., et al Kutzenberger & Wolff, Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 99950612.4 | 04.10.1999 | [2001/37] | WO1999EP07349 | Priority number, date | DE19981047845 | 16.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19847845 | [2001/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0023508 | Date: | 27.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1131374 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1131374 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, C08K3/34, B32B27/34, // C08L77:00 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
B32B27/18 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/306 (US);
B32B27/34 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08K3/34 (EP,US);
C08K7/00 (EP,US);
B32B2264/10 (US);
B32B2377/00 (US);
B32B2439/70 (US);
C08J2377/00 (EP,US);
C08K2201/011 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2817 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2826 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31732 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31746 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/34, C08L77/00 (EP,US);
C08K7/00, C08L77/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHGLÄNZENDE FLEXIBLE MEHRSCHICHTIGE FOLIE MIT AUSSENSCHICHT AUS POLYAMID ENTHALTEND NANODISPERSEN FÜLLSTOFF SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR VERPACKUNG VON LEBENSMITTELN | [2001/37] | English: | HIGH LUSTER, FLEXIBLE MULTILAYERED FILM WITH A POLYAMIDE OUTER LAYER CONTAINING NANODISPERSED FILLING MATERIAL AND UTILIZATION OF SAID FILM FOR PACKAGING FOODSTUFFS | [2001/37] | French: | FILM MULTICOUCHE SOUPLE TRES BRILLANT COMPORTANT UNE COUCHE EXTERIEURE EN POLYAMIDE CONTENANT DES NANOPARTICULES DE CHARGE DISPERSEES, ET SON UTILISATION POUR L'EMBALLAGE DE DENREES ALIMENTAIRES | [2001/37] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 11.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 02.07.2003 | DK | 02.10.2003 | GR | 02.10.2003 | PT | 02.10.2003 | SE | 02.10.2003 | CY | 04.10.2003 | LU | 04.10.2003 | MC | 31.10.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/39] | IE | 02.07.2003 | |
DK | 02.10.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
CY | 04.10.2003 | ||
LU | 04.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | IE | 02.07.2003 | |
DK | 02.10.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
CY | 04.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | IE | 02.07.2003 | |
DK | 02.10.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | GR | 02.10.2003 | |
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | GR | 02.10.2003 | |
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | PT | 02.10.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0358415 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [DA] 1* claims 1,3,4 *; | [A]EP0810259 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,4,6-8,10,13 *; | [DA]EP0818508 (WOLFF WALSRODE AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * claims 1,4,5,7,8,11,12 * * page 2, line 54 - page 3, line 29 * * page 3, line 54 - line 56 *; | [A]DE19631348 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1,2,4,5,12,14,15 *; | [A]DE19705998 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1,3,5,6 * |