EP1129519 - ELECTRONICALLY COMMUTATED MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ebm-papst St. Georgen GmbH & Co. KG Hermann-Papst-Strasse 1 78112 St. Georgen / DE | [2004/20] |
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states Papst-Motoren GmbH & Co. KG Hermann-Papst-Strasse 1 78112 St. Georgen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAHN, Alexander Unterdorfstrasse 31 D-88605 Boll / DE | 02 /
RAPPENECKER, Hermann Krankenhausstrasse 26 D-78147 Vöhrenbach / DE | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Raible, Hans Schoderstrasse 10 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Raible, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Schoderstrasse 10 70192 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99950767.6 | 21.10.1999 | [2001/36] | WO1999EP07998 | Priority number, date | DE1998151615 | 09.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19851615 | [2001/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0028646 | Date: | 18.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1129519 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1129519 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/00, H02P6/24 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
H02P6/24 (EP,US);
H02P6/16 (EP,US);
H02P6/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/36] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCH KOMMUTIERTER MOTOR MIT EINER KOMMUTIERUNGSANORDNUNG ZUM BREMSEN | [2001/36] | English: | ELECTRONICALLY COMMUTATED MOTOR | [2001/36] | French: | MOTEUR A COMMUTATION ELECTRONIQUE | [2001/36] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 31.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04017162.1 / EP1471628 | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.09.2004 | ES | 08.09.2004 | IE | 08.09.2004 | NL | 08.09.2004 | AT | 21.10.2004 | LU | 21.10.2004 | BE | 31.10.2004 | CH | 31.10.2004 | LI | 31.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | DK | 08.12.2004 | GR | 08.12.2004 | PT | 08.02.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | CY | 08.09.2004 | |
ES | 08.09.2004 | ||
IE | 08.09.2004 | ||
NL | 08.09.2004 | ||
AT | 21.10.2004 | ||
LU | 21.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
CH | 31.10.2004 | ||
LI | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | IE | 08.09.2004 | |
NL | 08.09.2004 | ||
AT | 21.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
CH | 31.10.2004 | ||
LI | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | IE | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
CH | 31.10.2004 | ||
LI | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | IE | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | IE | 08.09.2004 | |
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | IE | 08.09.2004 | |
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | IE | 08.09.2004 | |
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | GR | 08.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS6198187 ; | [Y]JPH1023779 ; | [Y]JPH0614583 ; | [A]JPH08223977 ; | [YA]EP0521709 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,10-12 * column 1, line 3 - line 7 * * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 11 * * column 5, line 5 - line 8 * * column 7, line 2 - line 11 * * figures 1,3 * [A] 13; | [A]EP0739084 (PAPST MOTOREN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,4 * column 1, line 6 - line 14 * * column 3, line 14 - line 26 * * column 4, line 28 - line 38 *; | [YA]US5773941 (MORITZ FREDERICK G [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 3, line 14 - line 22 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 * [A] 5 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860920), vol. 010, no. 279, Database accession no. (E - 439), & JP61098187 A 19860516 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 2 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, & JP10023779 A 19980123 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 10 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940420), vol. 018, no. 221, Database accession no. (E - 1540), & JP06014583 A 19940121 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [Y] 11,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, & JP08223977 A 19960830 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [A] 11,12 * abstract * | Examination | DE3629186 |