EP1124542 - CAPSULES WITH POROUS MINERAL CORTEX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHODIA CHIMIE 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [2001/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUPUIS, Dominique Appartement 40 60, rue Galliéni 95170 Deuil-la-Barre / FR | 02 /
JOURDAT, Catherine 4, Chemin du Vallon 69110 Sainte-Foy-Lès-Lyon / FR | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | Dubruc, Philippe Rhodia Services Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 40 Rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | Dubruc, Philippe Rhodia Services, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, 40, rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99950847.6 | 27.10.1999 | [2001/34] | WO1999FR02614 | Priority number, date | FR19980013695 | 30.10.1998 Original published format: FR 9813695 | [2001/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0025761 | Date: | 11.05.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1124542 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/50 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
C12N11/14 (EP);
B01J13/02 (EP);
C12N11/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAPSELN MIT EINER MINERALISCHEN PORÖSEN UMHÜLLUNG | [2001/34] | English: | CAPSULES WITH POROUS MINERAL CORTEX | [2001/34] | French: | CAPSULES A ECORCE MINERALE POREUSE | [2001/34] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 29.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/34] | 15.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9107349 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]); | JPH0775728 [ ] (SUZUKI YUSHI KOGYO KK, et al); | [A]WO9741842 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US]); | [X]US5693513 (POPE EDWARD J A [US]); | [XP]WO9909142 (SOLGENE THERAPEUTICS LLC [US]); |