EP1127007 - Blank for a container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/35] | CONTAINER | ||
[2003/02] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA PACKAGING LIMITED SCA Packaging House, 543 New Hythe Lane, Larkfield Aylesford, Maidstone Kent ME20 7PE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states SCA Packaging Limited SCA Packaging House, 543 New Hythe Lane, Larkfield Aylesford, Maidstone, Kent ME20 7PE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOUTERS, Wim Baron Descamplaan 94a B-3018 Leuven / BE | 02 /
ARTOIS, August Olmenhoekstraat 39 B-3071 Erps-Kwerps / BE | 03 /
KYNASTON-PEARSON, Anthony William Nigel Melita, Cheapside Bampton, Oxfordshire OX18 2JL / GB | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99950933.4 | 20.10.1999 | [2001/35] | WO1999GB03471 | Priority number, date | GB19980022926 | 20.10.1998 Original published format: GB 9822926 | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0023333 | Date: | 27.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1127007 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/02, B65D5/54 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
B65D5/0236 (EP);
B65D5/542 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU [2001/35] | Title | German: | Zuschnitt für einen Behälter | [2003/02] | English: | Blank for a container | [2003/02] | French: | Flan pour récipient | [2003/02] |
Former [2001/35] | BEHÄLTER | ||
Former [2001/35] | CONTAINER | ||
Former [2001/35] | RECIPIENTS | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 24.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/50] | 02.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3302857 (MARTIN DARYL T) [A] 10* figures 1,3 *; | [X]DE8914548U (WELLPAPPE FORCHHEIM) [X] 10 * page 3, line 1 - line 21; figure 1 *; | [XA]EP0780311 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 9-11,15 * column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 40; figures 1-4 * [A] 1; | [XA]JPH09240660 (KYOWA DAN BOARD KK) [X] 9-12,15 * figures 1-5 * [A] 1 |