EP1132804 - OPTICAL SCANNING TYPE TOUCH PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWAMOTO, Yasuhide, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
SANO, Satoshi, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
NAKAZAWA, Fumihiko, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
YAMAGUCHI, Nobuyasu, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99951181.9 | 29.10.1999 | [2001/37] | WO1999JP06069 | Priority number, date | JP19980331738 | 20.11.1998 Original published format: JP 33173898 | [2001/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0031618 | Date: | 02.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1132804 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.06.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
G06F3/0423 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/37] | G06F3/033, G06F3/03 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/37] | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGSEMPFINDLICES PANEEL VOM OPTISCHEN SCANNING TYP | [2001/37] | English: | OPTICAL SCANNING TYPE TOUCH PANEL | [2001/37] | French: | ECRAN TACTILE A BALAYAGE OPTIQUE | [2001/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2001 | Translation filed | 11.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2001 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 02.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/18] | 22.12.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.01.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/18] | Appeal following examination | 21.02.2007 | Appeal received No. T0739/07 | 20.04.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.01.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 20.01.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.01.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP07106379.6 / EP1808754 | EP07106391.1 / EP1837740 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4826271 (TAKAHASHI KIMIO [JP], et al) [A] 7,8 * column 2, line 53 - line 59 ** column 4, line 27 - line 30 * | International search | [Y]JPS6418823 (DALE ELECTRONICS); | [Y]JPH04223424 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JPH04247420 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH0643383 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [Y]JPH06148552 (SANKYO SEIKI SEISAKUSHO KK); | [A]EP0600576 (MICROFIELD GRAPHICS INC [US]); | [Y]JPH0798437 (MINOLTA CO LTD); | [Y]JPH09146026 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG); | [XP]JPH1185399 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD, et al) |