EP1104604 - EFFICIENT SPECTRAL SAVING FQPSK AND FQAM SIGNAL TRANSMISSION AND RECEPTION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kamilo, Feher 44685 Country Club Drive El Macero, CA 95618 / US | [2001/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/23] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/23] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99951374.0 | 09.08.1999 | [2001/23] | WO1999US17995 | Priority number, date | US19980095943P | 10.08.1998 Original published format: US 95943 P | [2001/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0010272 | Date: | 24.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1104604 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/18, H04L5/12, H04L23/02, H04L27/00, H04L27/01, H04L27/06, H04L27/10, H03D1/00 | [2001/23] | CPC: |
H04L7/0008 (EP,US);
H04L25/4902 (EP,US);
H04L27/00 (EP,US);
H04L27/0004 (EP,US);
H04L27/18 (EP,US);
H04L27/34 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2004/21] |
Former [2001/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EFFIZIENTE SPEKTRALSPARENDE FQPSK UND FQAM SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEME UND EMPFANGSSYSTEME | [2001/23] | English: | EFFICIENT SPECTRAL SAVING FQPSK AND FQAM SIGNAL TRANSMISSION AND RECEPTION SYSTEMS | [2001/23] | French: | SYSTEMES EMETTEURS-RECEPTEURS ECONOMISEURS SPECTRAUX RATIONNELS DE SIGNAUX FQPSK ET FQAM | [2001/23] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/23] | 10.12.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5327455 (DE GAUDENZI RICCARDO [NL], et al); | [X]US5784402 (FEHER KAMILO [US]); | [X]US5729570 (MAGILL DAVID T [US]); | [X]US5719899 (THIELECKE JORN [DE], et al); | [A]US5790588 (FUKAWA KAZUHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]US5732114 (THEBAULT BERTRAND [FR], et al); | [A]US4730344 (SAHA DEBABRATA [US]); | [A]US4567602 (KATO SHUZO [JP], et al) |