EP1119345 - ENCAPSULATION OF SENSITIVE LIQUID COMPONENTS INTO A MATRIX TO OBTAIN DISCRETE SHELF-STABLE PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MILLS, INC. Number One General Mills Boulevard Minneapolis Minnesota 55426 / US | [2009/18] |
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states GENERAL MILLS, INC. Number One General Mills Boulevard Minneapolis Minnesota 55426 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN LENGERICH, Bernhard, H. 18005 33rd Place N. Plymouth, MN 55447 / US | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | Quest, Barry, et al Wilson, Gunn, M'Caw, 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99951433.4 | 06.10.1999 | [2001/31] | WO1999US20905 | Priority number, date | US19980103700P | 09.10.1998 Original published format: US 103700 P | US19980109696P | 24.11.1998 Original published format: US 109696 P | US19990233443 | 20.01.1999 Original published format: US 233443 | [2001/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0021504 | Date: | 20.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1119345 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1119345 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.04.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A21D13/00, A23L1/00, A23L1/03, A21D13/08, A23L1/164, A23L1/22, A61K9/00, A61K9/16 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
A23L27/72 (EP);
A21D13/28 (EP);
A23L29/065 (EP);
A23L7/135 (EP);
A23L9/10 (EP);
A23P10/25 (EP);
A23P10/30 (EP);
A61K9/0056 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
B29B7/007 (EP);
B29B7/46 (EP);
B29B9/12 (EP);
B29C48/40 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2001/31] | A61K9/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 04.04.2001 | LV | 04.04.2001 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 04.04.2001 | SI | 04.04.2001 | Title | German: | VERKAPSELUNG EMPFINDLICHER FLÜSSIGER KOMPONENTEN IN EINE MATRIX ZUR GEWINNUNG DISKRETER LAGERBESTÄNDIGER PARTIKEL | [2001/31] | English: | ENCAPSULATION OF SENSITIVE LIQUID COMPONENTS INTO A MATRIX TO OBTAIN DISCRETE SHELF-STABLE PARTICLES | [2001/31] | French: | PARTICULES DISCRETES DE LONGUE CONSERVATION OBTENUES PAR ENCAPSULATION DE COMPOSANTS LIQUIDES SENSIBLES DANS UNE MATRICE | [2001/31] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2001 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 13.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.04.2009 | FI | 29.04.2009 | LU | 06.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/29] | FI | 29.04.2009 | |
LU | 06.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | FI | 29.04.2009 | |
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/06] | FI | 29.04.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB191015312 (HUTCHEON JOHN) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,11-15 * page 1, line 39 - page 2, line 39 *; | [X]EP0202409 (MILES LAB [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 2, lines 20-53 * * column 3, line 28 - column 5, line 40 * * example - *; | [X]WO9015537 (NABISCO BRANDS INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 20, line 13 - page 24, line 12 * * page 36, line 16 - page 37, line 8 * * page 43, lines 3-10 * * page 45, lines 19-25 * * page 50, lines 17-24 *; | [X]US5074902 (CONNICK JR WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 1, line 63 - column 4, line 15 * * example - *; | [X]US5079012 (LENGERICH BERNHARD V [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 7, lines 12-28 * * column 8, lines 36-47 * * column 9, lines 7-31 * * column 16, lines 50-55 * * column 23, lines 23-34 *; | [X]DE4041752 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-15 * page 2, line 44 - page 4, line 31 * * example - *; | [X]US5314692 (HAARASILTA ASKO N O [FI], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 2, line 28 - column 4, line 42 * * example - *; | [X]EP0705541 (KRAFT FOODS INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 3, line 13 - page 5, line 44 * * example 3 *; | [XD]WO9818610 (LENGERICH BERNHARD H VAN [US]) [XD] 1-15 * page 8, lines 2-21 * * page 24, line 24 - page 25, line 30 * * pages 26-31 * * page 33, line 10 - page 34, line 9 *; | [XP]WO9854980 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL], et al) [XP] 1-15 * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 10 * * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 29 * * page 8, line 21 - page 9, line 13 * * page 9, line 28 - page 10, line 8 * * page 10, line 19 - page 11, line 17 * * page 12, lines 14-27 * * example - *; | [XP]WO9948372 (GEN MILLS INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-15 * page 3, line 8 - page 16, line 9 * * page 25, line 1 - page 28, line 19 * * page 30, line 1 - page 31, line 20 ** example - * | International search | [A]US3786123 (KATZEN S) | by applicant | GB191015312 | EP0202409 | WO9015537 | US5074902 | DE4041752 | US5314692 | EP0705541 | WO9854980 | WO9948372 |