EP1117446 - PROCESS FOR REDUCING MINERALIZATION OF TISSUE USED IN TRANSPLANTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | For all designated states Torrianni, Mark W. 32882 Via Del Amo San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US | ||
For all designated states Torrianni, Mark W. 32882 Via Del Amo San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675 / US | |||
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states Medtronic Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | ||
For all designated states Torrianni, Mark W. 32882 Via Del Amo San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675 / US | |||
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states Medtronic Inc. 7000 Central Avenue Northeast Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | ||
For all designated states Torrianni, Mark W. 32882 Via Del Amo San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORRIANNI, Mark, W. 32882 Via Del Amo San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675 / US | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99951645.3 | 30.09.1999 | [2001/30] | WO1999US22550 | Priority number, date | US19980102514P | 30.09.1998 Original published format: US 102514 P | US19980103697P | 09.10.1998 Original published format: US 103697 P | US19980105949P | 28.10.1998 Original published format: US 105949 P | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0018445 | Date: | 06.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1117446 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1117446 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/36 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
A61L27/3687 (EP,US);
A61L27/3604 (EP,US);
A61L27/3625 (EP,US);
A61L27/3645 (EP,US);
A61F2/2412 (EP,US);
A61L2400/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2004/48] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER MINERALISIERUNG VON GEWEBE ZUM GEBRAUCH BEI TRANSPLANTATION | [2001/30] | English: | PROCESS FOR REDUCING MINERALIZATION OF TISSUE USED IN TRANSPLANTATION | [2001/30] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE LA MINERALISATION D'UN TISSU UTILISE POUR UNE TRANSPLANTATION | [2001/30] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 21.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 24.11.2004 | IT | 24.11.2004 | LI | 24.11.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2005/25] | CH | 24.11.2004 | |
LI | 24.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8401879 (AMERICAN HOSPITAL SUPPLY CORP [US]) [A] 1-7,12-14,16,17,19-23,25,29,30 * page 3, line 7 - line 38 * * page 4, line 7 - line 19 * * page 5, line 5 - page 8, line 17 * * examples 8,9,12-15 *; | [A]EP0172716 (SHILEY INC [US]) [A] 1,3-6,12-14,17-20,22-24,26,27,29,30 * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 3, paragraph 3 ** example 1 *; | [X]EP0364517 (BIOMEDICAL DESIGN INC [US]) [X] 1-6,12-17,19,20,25 * page 3, line 34 - line 47 * * page 5, line 12 - line 54 * * example 4 *; | [X] - "CHEMICAL MODIFICATION OF IMPLANTABLE BIOLOGIC TISSUE FOR ANTI- CALCIFICATION", ASAIO JOURNAL,US,J.B.LIPPINCOTT CO.,HAGERSTOWN,MD, (19940701), vol. 40, no. 3, ISSN 1058-2916, pages 377 - 382, XP000498225 [X] 1-7,12-21,25-30 * page M377, column R, paragraph 4 - page M378, column R, paragraph 3 * * page M381, column L, paragraph 3 - page M382, column L, paragraph 2 * | [X] - TOMAZIC B.B., BROWN W.E., EANES E.D., "A critical evaluation of the purification of biominerals by hypochlorite treatment", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH, pages 217 - 225, XP000874597 [X] 1-9,12,14 * page 218, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jbm.820270211 |