EP1118210 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PREVENTING KEYSTONE DISTORTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magic Pixel, Inc. 5F, No. 3 Creation Road III Science Park Hsinchu 300 / TW | [2008/34] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states Macronix International Co., Ltd. No.3, Creation Road 3rd, Science-Based Industrial Park Hsinchu 300 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Chun-Hung 483 Pilgrim Loop Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Shuei-Lin 9F-1, 38 Yi-Kuang Street Kao-Hsiung City Taiwan 807 / TW | 03 /
TING, Hou-Chun 14 Sze-Wei Road Lu-Kang Town, Chang-Hua Taiwan 505 / TW | 04 /
YANG, Meng-Shan 59 Ta-Ya Road Tai-Chi Village, Pao-Shan Hsiang, Hsin-C / TW | 05 /
CHANG, Ting-Yao 5F, 14 Alley 7 Lane 90, Chien-Chung Street Hsin-Chuang City, Taipei, Taiwan 242 / TW | 06 /
KUO, Chun-Hao 8F, 54 Lane 47 Sec. 1, Kuang-Fu Road Hsin-Chu City, Taiwan 300 / TW | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2003/33] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley, 11 Mespil Road Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2001/30] | Hanna, Peter William Derek Peter Hanna Associates 11 Mespil Road Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 99951673.5 | 01.10.1999 | [2001/30] | WO1999US22726 | Priority number, date | US19980102889P | 02.10.1998 Original published format: US 102889 P | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0021282 | Date: | 13.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1118210 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.04.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/22, H04N3/26, H04N3/23, H04N3/223, H04N3/227 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
H04N9/3185 (EP,US);
H04N3/2335 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DK, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | GERAET UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERMEIDUNG VON TRAPEZOIDALBILDABWEICHUNGEN | [2001/30] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PREVENTING KEYSTONE DISTORTION | [2001/30] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR EMPECHER LA DISTORSION EN TRAPEZE | [2001/30] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 31.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/29] | 26.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/29] | Divisional application(s) | EP07107583.2 / EP1811766 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH06164966 ; | [XA]EP0756425 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 12,38 * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 16 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 8 * * column 5, line 57 - column 8, line 24; figure 7 * [A] 1,8,11,23,25,30; | [A]US5200815 (TSUJIHARA SUSUMU [JP], et al) [A] 36 * abstract * * column 4, line 44 - line 61 * * column 7, line 41 - column 8, line 35; figures 5,6,10 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940912), vol. 018, no. 488, Database accession no. (E - 1605), & JP06164966 A 19940610 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,4 * abstract * [A] 8,9,12,13,23-25,30,38 | International search | [X]US5764311 (BONDE HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [X]US5465121 (BLALOCK JAMES L [US], et al); | [A]US3637308 (RAALTE JOHN A VAN, et al); | [A]US5716118 (SATO AKIRA [JP], et al); | [A]US5640479 (HEGG RONALD [US], et al); | [A]US5355188 (BILES JONATHAN R [US], et al); | [A]US5008702 (TANAKA TSUTOMU [JP], et al); | [A]US3790267 (RAMBERG E) |