EP1104615 - DETERMINATION OF THE OPERABILITY OF A RADIO CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/23] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMPERSCHROER, Erich Am Königsbach 27 D-46499 Hamminkeln / DE | 02 /
BENZ, Michael Schuckertdamm 328 D-13629 Berlin / DE | 03 /
BOLINTH, Edgar Rheindahlener Str. 88 D-41189 Mönchengladbach / DE | 04 /
FÄRBER, Michael Schießstättstr. 12 a D-82515 Wolfratshausen / DE | 05 /
KLEIN, Anja Paderborner Str. 8 D-10709 Berlin / DE | 06 /
KOTTKAMP, Meik Hirsch-Gereuth-Str. 54 D-81369 München / DE | 07 /
SCHWARK, Uwe Freiheitstr. 6 D-46399 Bocholt / DE | 08 /
SITTE, Armin Prenzlauer Allee 237 D-10405 Berlin / DE | 09 /
ULRICH, Thomas Sandhauser Str. 109 b D-13505 Berlin / DE | [2008/39] |
Former [2001/23] | 01 /
KAMPERSCHROER, Erich Am Königsbach 27 D-46499 Hamminkeln / DE | ||
02 /
BENZ, Michael Schuckertdamm 328 D-13629 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
BOLINTH, Edgar Rheindahlener Str. 88 D-41189 Mönchengladbach / DE | |||
04 /
FÄRBER, Michael Schie stättstr. 12 a D-82515 Wolfratshausen / DE | |||
05 /
KLEIN, Anja Paderborner Str. 8 D-10709 Berlin / DE | |||
06 /
KOTTKAMP, Meik Hirsch-Gereuth-Str. 54 D-81369 München / DE | |||
07 /
SCHWARK, Uwe Freiheitstr. 6 D-46399 Bocholt / DE | |||
08 /
SITTE, Armin Prenzlauer Allee 237 D-10405 Berlin / DE | |||
09 /
ULRICH, Thomas Sandhauser Str. 109 b D-13505 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 99952250.1 | 03.08.1999 | [2001/23] | WO1999DE02383 | Priority number, date | DE1998136575 | 12.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19836575 | [2001/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0010312 | Date: | 24.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1104615 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1104615 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, H04W72/06, H04B17/00 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
H04W24/00 (EP);
H04B17/382 (EP);
H04M1/72511 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/23] | H04M1/725, H04Q7/38, H04Q7/32, H04B17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2001/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ERMITTLUNG DER NUTZBARKEIT EINES FUNKKANALS | [2001/23] | English: | DETERMINATION OF THE OPERABILITY OF A RADIO CHANNEL | [2001/23] | French: | DETERMINATION DE L'EXPLOITABILITE D'UN CANAL RADIO | [2001/23] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/23] | 01.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5483666 (YAMADA JUN [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,8,10* column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 46 *; | [X]WO9747147 (GTE MOBILE COMM SERVINC [US]) [X] 1-5,9 * page 20, line 3 - page 21, line 8 * |