EP1144989 - NANOTOMOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magerle, Robert Lisztstrasse 1 95444 Bayreuth / DE | [2001/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Bauer, Wulf Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Bauer, Wulf, Dr. Bayenthalgürtel 15 50968 Köln (Marienburg) / DE | Application number, filing date | 99952429.1 | 17.08.1999 | [2001/42] | WO1999DE02577 | Priority number, date | DE1998159877 | 23.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19859877 | [2001/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0039569 | Date: | 06.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1144989 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1144989 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/00, G01B7/34 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
G01Q30/04 (EP,US);
B82Y15/00 (EP);
G01Q30/20 (EP,US);
Y10S977/852 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Title | German: | NANOTOMOGRAPHIE | [2001/42] | English: | NANOTOMOGRAPHY | [2001/42] | French: | NANOTOMOGRAPHIE | [2001/42] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 27.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 15.01.2003 | GR | 15.01.2003 | IE | 15.01.2003 | IT | 15.01.2003 | NL | 15.01.2003 | DK | 15.04.2003 | SE | 15.04.2003 | PT | 17.04.2003 | ES | 30.07.2003 | AT | 17.08.2003 | CY | 17.08.2003 | LU | 17.08.2003 | BE | 31.08.2003 | CH | 31.08.2003 | LI | 31.08.2003 | MC | 31.08.2003 | [2008/18] |
Former [2005/11] | FI | 15.01.2003 | |
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
IE | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 17.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
AT | 17.08.2003 | ||
CY | 17.08.2003 | ||
LU | 17.08.2003 | ||
BE | 31.08.2003 | ||
CH | 31.08.2003 | ||
LI | 31.08.2003 | ||
MC | 31.08.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 15.01.2003 | |
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
IE | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 17.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
CY | 17.08.2003 | ||
LU | 17.08.2003 | ||
BE | 31.08.2003 | ||
CH | 31.08.2003 | ||
LI | 31.08.2003 | ||
MC | 31.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/52] | FI | 15.01.2003 | |
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
IE | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 17.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
CY | 17.08.2003 | ||
LU | 17.08.2003 | ||
BE | 31.08.2003 | ||
CH | 31.08.2003 | ||
LI | 31.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 15.01.2003 | |
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
IE | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 17.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
CY | 17.08.2003 | ||
LU | 17.08.2003 | ||
CH | 31.08.2003 | ||
LI | 31.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 15.01.2003 | |
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
IE | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 17.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
CY | 17.08.2003 | ||
CH | 31.08.2003 | ||
LI | 31.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 15.01.2003 | |
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
IE | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 17.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
CH | 31.08.2003 | ||
LI | 31.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 15.01.2003 | |
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
IE | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 17.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | FI | 15.01.2003 | |
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
IE | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 17.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 15.01.2003 | |
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 17.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 15.01.2003 | |
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 17.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 15.01.2003 | |
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 15.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH08160058 ; | [A]JPS52137396 ; | [A] - RETTIG R ET AL, "Atomic scale properties of interior interfaces of semiconductor heterostructures as determined by quasi-digital highly selective etching and atomic force microscopy", EIGHTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MODULATED SEMICONDUCTOR STRUCTURES. MSS8, SANTA BARBARA, CA, USA, 14-18 JULY 1997, Physica E, 15 July 1998, Elsevier, Netherlands, vol. 2, no. 1-4, ISSN 1386-9477, pages 277 - 281, XP000870399 [A] 1-4,8-11,16,17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1386-9477(98)00058-7 | [A] - CHANG D C ET AL, "Micro structural investigation of porous silicon depth profile by direct surface force microscopy", SURFACE/INTERFACE AND STRESS EFFECTS IN ELECTRONIC MATERIAL NANOSTRUCTURES. SYMPOSIUM, SURFACE/INTERFACE AND STRESS EFFECTS IN ELECTRONIC MATERIAL NANOSTRUCTURES. SYMPOSIUM, BOSTON, MA, USA, 27 NOV.-1 DEC. 1995, 1996, Pittsburgh, PA, USA, Mater. Res. Soc, USA, pages 173 - 177, XP000870218 [A] 1-4,8-11,16,17,19 * the whole document * | [A] - KALUKIN A R ET AL, "Effects of feature orientation in tomographic reconstructions", X-RAY MICROFOCUSING: APPLICATIONS AND TECHNIQUES, SAN DIEGO, CA, USA, 22-23 JULY 1998, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 1998, SPIE-Int. Soc. Opt. Eng, USA, vol. 3449, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 36 - 44, XP000869951 [A] 1-3,6,10,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.330353 | [A] - HARRISON C ET AL, "Layer by layer imaging of diblock copolymer films with a scanning electron microscope", POLYMER,GB,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, vol. 39, no. 13, ISSN 0032-3861, page 2733-2744, XP004112216 [A] 1-3 * page 2733, column R, paragraph 2 - page 2734, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 2742, column L, paragraph 2 - page 2743, column L, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0032-3861(97)00613-7 | [A] - VAEZ-IRAVANI M ET AL, "CORRELATIVE IMAGING IN SCANNING NEAR-FIELD OPTICAL MICROSCOPY", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART A,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, vol. 11, no. 4, PART 01, ISSN 0734-2101, page 742-747, XP000403702 [A] 1,2,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.578340 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 1996, no. 10, & JP08160058 A 19960621 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-3,6,10-13 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1978, no. 01, Database accession no. 1978-00976A, XP002128666 & JPS52137396 A 19771116 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |