EP1043763 - VAPOR GROWTH APPARATUS FOR SEMICONDUCTOR WAFERS WITH DOPANT GAS FEED ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/41] | SEMICONDUCTOR WAFER AND VAPOR GROWTH APPARATUS | ||
[2010/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/17] |
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd 4-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSE, Hiroki c/o Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. Isobe Plant, 2-13-1, Isobe Annaka-shi, Gumma 379-0196 / JP | [2011/01] |
Former [2000/41] | 01 /
OSE, Hiroki Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. Isobe Plant 2-13-1, Isobe Annaka-shi, Gumma 379-0196 / JP | Representative(s) | Merkle, Gebhard, et al Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Merkle, Gebhard, et al TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99952798.9 | 28.10.1999 | [2000/41] | WO1999JP05968 | Priority number, date | JP19980326034 | 29.10.1998 Original published format: JP 32603498 | [2000/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0026948 | Date: | 11.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1043763 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1043763 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.05.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/205, H01L21/22, C30B23/02, C30B23/04, C30B23/06, C30B23/08, C23C16/44 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
C23C16/45563 (EP,US);
C23C16/45574 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/45561 (EP,KR,US);
C30B25/14 (EP,KR,US);
C30B29/06 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02381 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02579 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/0262 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02532 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2000/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR GASPHASENABSCHEIDUNG FÜR HALBLEITERSCHEIBEN MIT DOTIERGAS-ZUFUHREINRICHTUNG | [2010/34] | English: | VAPOR GROWTH APPARATUS FOR SEMICONDUCTOR WAFERS WITH DOPANT GAS FEED ASSEMBLY | [2010/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CROISSANCE EN PHASE VAPEUR POUR PLAQUETTES SEMICONDUCTRICES AVEC SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION EN GAZ DOPANT | [2010/26] |
Former [2000/41] | HALBLEITERSCHEIBE UND ABSCHEIDUNGSAPPARAT FÜR ABSCHEIDUNGEN AUS DER GAS-PHASE | ||
Former [2000/41] | SEMICONDUCTOR WAFER AND VAPOR GROWTH APPARATUS | ||
Former [2000/41] | PLAQUETTE A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET DISPOSITIF DE CRISTALLISATION EN PHASE VAPEUR | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2000 | Translation filed | 28.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2000 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.01.2011 | [2012/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPS61101020 ; | [PX]JPH11238688 ; | [XY]EP0637058 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [X] 7,9 * column 1, line 18 - column 2, line 5; figure 1 * * column 6, line 6 - line 20; figure 6 * * column 7, line 23 - line 52; figure 7 * * column 7, line 53 - column 8, line 12; figure 8 * [Y] 8,11; | [YA]US5487358 (OHTA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6,11 * column 1, line 15 - line 33; figure 7 * * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 19; figure 1 * * column 5, line 35 - line 63 * * column 6, line 15 - line 42; figures 5,6 * * column 6, line 54 - line 59 * [A] 7-9; | [Y]EP0784106 (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * examples 2-5; table 1 *; | [XY]DE19801439 (SEH AMERICA INC [US]) [X] 7,9 * page 2, line 3 - line 6 * * page 2, line 47 - line 67 * * page 3, line 6 - line 18 * * page 3, line 47 - page 4, line 6; figure 1 * * page 5, line 1 - line 28; figure 4 * * page 6, line 48 - line 66; figure 7 * [Y] 1-6,8,11 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860926), vol. 010, no. 283, Database accession no. (E - 440), & JP61101020 A 19860519 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 8 * abstract * [A] 7,9-11 | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, & JP11238688 A 19990831 (SHIN ETSU HANDOTAI CO LTD) [PX] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] * | International search | [A]JPS5936927 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPH05226263 (NEC CORP); | [A]EP0784106 (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO [JP], et al); | [A]US5755878 (HABUKA HITOSHI [JP], et al) |