EP1079850 - COMPOUND DELIVERY USING RAPIDLY DISSOLVING COLLAGEN FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Collagenesis Inc. 500 Cummings Center 464C Beverly MA 01915 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states Collagenesis Inc. 500 Cummings Center 464C Beverly, MA 01915 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEVORE, Dale, P. 3 Warwick Drive Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | 02 /
EIFERMAN, Richard, A. 4 Riverhill Road Louisville, KY 40207 / US | 03 /
KEATES, Edwin, U. 1316 Wrenfield Way Villanova, PA 19085 / US | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Bösl, Raphael Konrad, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Bösl, Raphael Konrad, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/15] | Bösl, Raphael, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Postfach 860 880 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/10] | Bösl, Raphael, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99953288.0 | 20.05.1999 | [2001/10] | WO1999US11390 | Priority number, date | US19980083899 | 22.05.1998 Original published format: US 83899 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9961047 | Date: | 02.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1079850 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, A61K38/00, C07K1/00, A61M31/00, A61K9/70 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
A61K9/7007 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/10] | A61K38/17, A61K38/00, C07K1/00, A61M31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/10] | Title | German: | VERABREICHUNG VON VERBINDUNGEN MITTELS EINES SCHNELL AUFLÖSENDEN KOLLAGEN FILMS | [2001/10] | English: | COMPOUND DELIVERY USING RAPIDLY DISSOLVING COLLAGEN FILM | [2001/10] | French: | ADMINISTRATION D'UN COMPOSE PAR DISSOLUTION RAPIDE DE FILM COLLAGENE | [2001/10] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 20.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/15] | 04.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.12.2002 | 31.05.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5042025 ; | [X]US4164559 (DUNN MICHAEL W [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8* claims 1,3 *; | [X] - DEVORE, D. P. (1) ET AL, "Delivery of mitomycin C using rapidly dissolving collagen films.", IOVS, (MARCH 15, 1998) VOL. 39, NO. 4, PP. S253. MEETING INFO.: ANNUAL MEETING OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCH IN VISION AND OPHTHALMOLOGY FORT LAUDERDALE, FLORIDA, USA MAY 10-15, 1998 ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCH IN VISION AND OPHTHALMOLOGY., XP001037073 [X] 1-18 * abstract * | [X] - RUBIN, ALBERT L. ET AL, "Collagen as a vehicle for drug delivery. Preliminary report", J. CLIN. PHARMACOL. (1973), 13(8-9), 309-12, XP001038608 [X] 4,8,9 * page 310, column R, paragraph 3 - column L, paragraph L * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1975, no. 32, Database accession no. 1975-53113W, XP002186539 & JPS5042025 A 19750416 (JAPAN LEATHER IND KK) [X] 3,4 * abstract * | International search | [X]US4713446 (DEVORE DALE P [US], et al); | [X]US5492135 (DEVORE DALE P [US], et al); | [A]US5631243 (KELMAN CHARLES D [US], et al); | [Y] - COSTA V. P., ET AL., "WOUND HEALING MODULATION IN GLAUCOMA FILTRATION SURGERY.", OPHTHALMIC SURGERY, SLACK, PITMAN, NJ, US, US, (19930301), vol. 24., no. 03., ISSN 0022-023X, pages 152 - 170., XP002923717 | [Y] - PANDURANGA RAO K, "RECENT DEVELOPMENTS OF COLLAGEN-BASED MATERIALS FOR MEDICAL APPLICATIONS AND DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS", JOURNAL OF BIOMATERIALS SCIENCE. POLYMER EDITION., VSP, UTRECHT., NL, NL, (19950101), vol. 07, no. 07, ISSN 0920-5063, pages 623 - 645, XP002923718 | [Y] - BELYEA D A, ET AL., "MIDTERM FOLLOW-UP RESULTS OF COMBINED PHACOEMULSIFICATION LENS IMPLANTATION AND MITOMYCIN-C TRABECULECTOMY PROCEDURE", JOURNAL OF GLAUCOMA, NEW YORK, NY, US, US, (19970101), ISSN 1057-0829, pages 90 - 98, XP002923719 |