EP1090412 - MASS SPECTROMETRY WITH MULTIPOLE ION GUIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PerkinElmer Health Sciences, Inc. 940 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451-1457 / US | [2011/13] |
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states ANALYTICA OF BRANFORD, INC. 29 Business Park Drive Branford, CT 06405 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whitehouse, Craig M., @Analytica of Branford, Inc. 29 Business Park Drive Branford, CT 06405 / US | 02 /
Andrien, Bruce A., Jr., @Analytica of Branford Inc 29 Business Park Drive Branford, CT 06405 / US | 03 /
Gulcicek, Erol E., @Analytica of Branford, Inc. 29 Business Park Drive Branford, CT 06405 / US | [2014/10] |
Former [2001/15] | 01 /
Whitehouse, Craig M., Analytica of Branford, Inc. 29 Business Park Drive Branford, CT 06405 / US | ||
02 /
Andrien, Bruce A., Jr., Analytica of Branford Inc 29 Business Park Drive Branford, CT 06405 / US | |||
03 /
Gulcicek, Erol E., Analytica of Branford, Inc. 29 Business Park Drive Branford, CT 06405 / US | Representative(s) | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [2014/10] |
Former [2011/13] | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/05] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
Former [2001/15] | Granleese, Rhian Jane, et al Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99953401.9 | 29.05.1999 | [2001/15] | WO1999US12169 | Priority number, date | US19980087246P | 29.05.1998 Original published format: US 87246 P | US19990235946 | 22.01.1999 Original published format: US 235946 | [2001/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9962101 | Date: | 02.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1090412 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1090412 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/06, H01J49/42 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
H01J49/063 (EP);
H01J49/004 (EP);
H01J49/4225 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/15] | H01J49/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/15] | Title | German: | MASSENSPEKTROMETRIE MIT MULTIPOLIONENLEITERN | [2001/15] | English: | MASS SPECTROMETRY WITH MULTIPOLE ION GUIDES | [2001/15] | French: | SPECTROMETRIE DE MASSE AVEC GUIDES D'IONS MULTIPOLAIRES | [2001/15] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2000 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.11.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 19.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/13] | 01.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/29] | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/29] | 04.07.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.07.2013 | 05.07.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2006 | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/07] | Request for further processing for: | 21.01.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 21.01.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.06.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.01.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 14.01.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.06.2012 | Decision despatched | 14.01.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 14.01.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.02.2009 | Decision despatched | 14.01.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 14.01.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.02.2009 | Decision despatched | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 01.05.2009 | Date of receipt | 04.08.2010 | Request accepted | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.06.2004 | 31.05.2005 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   14.09.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.03.2014 | BE | 05.03.2014 | CY | 05.03.2014 | DK | 05.03.2014 | ES | 05.03.2014 | FI | 05.03.2014 | IT | 05.03.2014 | MC | 05.03.2014 | NL | 05.03.2014 | SE | 05.03.2014 | IE | 29.05.2014 | LU | 29.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | FR | 02.06.2014 | GR | 06.06.2014 | PT | 07.07.2014 | [2016/31] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9806481 (ANALYTICA OF BRANFORD, INC) [Y] 2-9,11-21 * abstract * * page 20 *; | [A]GB2299446 (* BRUKER-FRANZEN ANALYTIK GMBH) [A] 18-21 * abstract * | [XY] - CHENG X ET AL, "Interface for a Four-Sector Mass Spectrometer with a Dual-Purpose Collision Cell: High Transmission at Low to Intermediate Energies", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MASS SPECTROMETRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE INC, US, (199503), vol. 6, no. 3, ISSN 1044-0305, pages 175 - 186, XP004052030 [X] 1,10,22-24 * page 8, column L, paragraph 1 * [Y] 2-9,11-21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1044-0305(94)00156-T | International search | [X]US5652427 (WHITEHOUSE CRAIG M [US], et al); | [Y]EP0237259 (FINNIGAN CORP [US]) | Examination | EP1057209 | WO9707530 | WO9938193 | WO9747025 | WO9930350 | WO9702591 | EP0871201 | US5179278 | by applicant | US4328420 | US5652427 | US19960694542 |