EP1144455 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CELLULOSE SUSPENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer AG Borsigallee 1 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2003/43] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states Alceru Schwarza GmbH Breitscheidstrasse 148 07407 Rudolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLECH, Marco Glacisweg 31 D-55252 Mainz-Kastel / DE | 02 /
KAGALOWSKI, Leo Elsheimer Strasse 4 D-60322 Frankfurt/Main / DE | 03 /
KIND, Uwe Kastanienring 37 D-07407 Rudolstadt / DE | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Brandenburg, Thomas Patentanwalt Lindenstrasse 1 53773 Hennef / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Brandenburg, Thomas, Dr. Frankfurter Strasse 68 53773 Hennef / DE | Application number, filing date | 99953527.1 | 13.08.1999 | [2001/42] | WO1999DE02583 | Priority number, date | DE1998137210 | 17.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19837210 | [2001/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0009563 | Date: | 24.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1144455 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1144455 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08B1/00 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
D01F2/00 (EP,US);
C08B1/003 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER CELLULOSESUSPENSION | [2001/42] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CELLULOSE SUSPENSION | [2001/42] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UNE SUSPENSION DE CELLULOSE | [2001/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 20.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.09.2003 | DK | 24.12.2003 | GR | 24.12.2003 | PT | 24.02.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | CY | 24.09.2003 | |
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/41] | DK | 24.12.2003 | |
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | GR | 24.12.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DD226573 (SCHWARZA CHEMIEFASER [DD]) [Y] 1-11 * page 3, paragraph 2 *; | [Y]EP0356419 (CHEMIEFASER LENZING AG [AT]) [Y] 1-11 * page 2, line 28 - line 35 *; | [Y]WO9511261 (CHEMIEFASER LENZING AG [AT]) [Y] 1-11 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 4 *; | [A]WO9747790 (KOREA INST SCI & TECH [KR], et al) |