EP1124980 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF QUERCETIN AND ISOQUERCETIN DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCHHOLZ, Herwig Auf dem Mühlberg 75 D-60599 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
ROSSKOPF, Ralf Friedhofstrasse 26 D-64839 Münster / DE | [2001/34] | Application number, filing date | 99953802.8 | 13.10.1999 | [2001/34] | WO1999EP07685 | Priority number, date | DE1998150282 | 30.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19850282 | DE1998150570 | 02.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19850570 | [2001/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0026399 | Date: | 11.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1124980 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12P17/06, C12P19/60, C07H17/07, A61K31/70, A23L1/03, A61K31/35, A61K7/42 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
A23L33/10 (EP);
A61K8/498 (EP,KR);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP,KR);
C07D311/30 (EP,KR);
C07H15/26 (EP);
C12P17/06 (EP,KR);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/2116 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON QUERCETIN- UND ISOQUERCETIN-DERIVATEN | [2001/34] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF QUERCETIN AND ISOQUERCETIN DERIVATIVES | [2001/34] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE DERIVES DE QUERCETINE ET D'ISOQUERCETINE | [2001/34] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 04.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/45] | 07.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YX]US3420815 (COURBAT PIERRE J) [Y] 1-12 * siehe Spalte 1, Zeilen 65-70;; example VII * [X] 13,14; | [XY]JPH01308476 ; | [Y]US4603046 (GEORGALAS ARTHUR C W [US], et al) [Y] 9-12 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH092917 ; | [Y]JPH03255013 | [X] - WURM ET AL., "Reioselektive O-hydroxyethylierung von Qercetin", ARCH. PHARM., (1985), vol. 318, pages 747 - 753, XP000882424 [X] 1-14 * siehe Seite 5, Herstellung von 5; siehe weiter Seite 747 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ardp.19853180814 | [Y] - IOKU ET AL., "b-Glucosidase activity in the rat small intestine toward quercetin monoglucosides", BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM., (1998), vol. 62, no. 7, pages 1428 - 1431, XP000882413 [Y] 1-6 * page 1430 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.62.1428 | [Y] - ISHIDA ET AL., "Studies on the antihemorrhagic substances in herbs ...", CHEM.PHARM.BULL., (1988), vol. 36, no. 11, pages 4414 - 4420, XP002134480 [Y] 1-6 * siehe Seiten 4417 and 4419, Herstellung 4 * | [A] - LOA-JER ET AL., "Structural aspects of anthocyanin-flavonoid complex...", PYTOCHEMISTRY, (1981), vol. 20, pages 297 - 303, XP002134481 [A] 13,14 * page 301 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-9422(81)85111-4 | [XY] - REKKA ET AL., "Effect of hydroxyethyl rutosides and...", J.PHARM.PHARMACOL., (1991), vol. 43, pages 486 - 491, XP000882428 [XY] 7-12 * tables 1-3 * | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 05, Database accession no. 1990-032314, XP002137677 & JPH01308476 A 19891213 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [XY] 9-12 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 11, Database accession no. 1997-115173, XP002137678 & JPH092917 A 19970107 (ASAHI BREWERIES LTD) [Y] 7-12 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 02, Database accession no. 1992-011304, XP002137679 & JPH03255013 A 19911113 (DAIICHI PHARM CO LTD) [Y] 9-12 * abstract * |