EP1074471 - MACHINE FOR THE FABRICATION OF CONTAINERS WITH CONSUMABLE CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gomez Laguna, Vicente Calle General Ramos Serrano, 12, 4 38004 Santa Cruz de Tenerife / ES | [2001/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | Asensio Fernandez-Castanys, Trinidad Offitec, S.L. C/Doctor Fleming, 16 entreplanta 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | Asensio Fernandez-Castanys, Trinidad OFFITEC, S.L. C/Doctor Fleming, 16 -entreplanta- 28036 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2001/06] | Asensio Fernandez-Castanys, Trinidad Doctor Fleming, 16-Entr. 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 99953983.6 | 22.10.1999 | [2001/06] | WO1999ES00341 | Priority number, date | ES19980002235 | 23.10.1998 Original published format: ES 9802235 | [2001/06] | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0024635 | Date: | 04.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1074471 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1074471 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 04.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/04, B29C51/00 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
B65B9/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/06] | Title | German: | MASCHINE ZUM HERSTELLEN UND BEFÜLLEN VON BEHÄLTERN | [2001/06] | English: | MACHINE FOR THE FABRICATION OF CONTAINERS WITH CONSUMABLE CONTENT | [2001/06] | French: | MACHINE A FABRIQUER DES EMBALLAGES RENFERMANT UN CONTENU CONSOMMABLE | [2001/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2000 | Translation filed | 17.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 03.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.03.2004 | BE | 10.03.2004 | CH | 10.03.2004 | CY | 10.03.2004 | FI | 10.03.2004 | LI | 10.03.2004 | NL | 10.03.2004 | DK | 10.06.2004 | GR | 10.06.2004 | SE | 10.06.2004 | ES | 21.06.2004 | PT | 10.08.2004 | IE | 22.10.2004 | LU | 22.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
CY | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
IE | 22.10.2004 | ||
LU | 22.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
IE | 22.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/05] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
SE | 10.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3659993 (BROWN FRED P JR); | [A]US3808772 (TURTSCHAN A); | [A]US3837782 (MEISSNER K, et al); | [A]US3918237 (STARK SVEN OLOF SOREN, et al) |