EP1127871 - NEW ESTERS DERIVED FROM SUBSTITUTED PHENYL-CYCLOHEXYL COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LABORATORIOS VITA, S.A. Avda. de Barcelona, 69 08970 Sant Joan Despi (Barcelona) / ES | [2003/31] |
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states VITA-INVEST, S.A. Calle Fontsanta, 12-14 E-08970 Sant-Joan-Despi / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEL CASTILLO NIETO, Juan Carlos Calle Castillejos, 389 E-08025 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
CHALAUX FREIXA, Maria Calle Pi i Margall, 46 E-08025 Barcelona / ES | 03 /
HUGUET CLOTET, Joan Calle Riera d'en Nofre, 11 E-08970 Sant Joan Despi / ES | 04 /
MOURELLE MANCINI, Marisabel Avenida de Xile, Planta 11 E-08028 Barcelona / ES | 05 /
DE RAMON AMAT, Elisabet Calle Poesia, 11 E-08035 Barcelona / ES | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Ponti Sales, Adelaida, et al Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent, 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Ponti Sales, Adelaida, et al Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2001/35] | Ponti Sales, Adelaida, et al Consell de Cent 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 99953994.3 | 04.11.1999 | [2001/35] | WO1999ES00352 | Priority number, date | ES19980002329 | 06.11.1998 Original published format: ES 9802329 | [2001/35] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0027799 | Date: | 18.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1127871 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1127871 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C219/26, C07D207/337, A61K31/24 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
C07C271/44 (EP,US);
C07C219/26 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
C07C219/28 (EP,US);
C07C219/30 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
C07B2200/07 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
C07C2601/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/37] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | 17.05.2001 | LT | 17.05.2001 | LV | 17.05.2001 | MK | 17.05.2001 | RO | 17.05.2001 | SI | 17.05.2001 | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE ESTER ABGELEITET VON SUBSTITUIERTEN PHENYL-CYCLOHEXYL-VERBINDUNGEN | [2001/35] | English: | NEW ESTERS DERIVED FROM SUBSTITUTED PHENYL-CYCLOHEXYL COMPOUNDS | [2001/35] | French: | NOUVEAUX ESTERS DERIVES DE COMPOSES PHENYL-CYCLOHEXYLE SUBSTITUES | [2001/35] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2001 | Translation filed | 17.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 10.07.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02075837.1 / EP1219623 | EP02075838.9 / EP1219594 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 10.09.2003 | [2008/24] | Cited in | International search | [A]GB997399 (GRUENENTHAL CHEMIE) [A] 1-12 * claims 2,7,8,15 *; | [A]US3652589 (FLICK KURT, et al) [A] 1-12 * claims 2-23 *; | [A]US5733936 (BUSCHMANN HELMUT HEINRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * example -; claims 2,4,5 *; | [A] - TAKESHI ET AL, "Synthesis and Analgesic Activity of Cyclohexenylmethylamines and Related Compounds", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, (1984), vol. 32, no. 6, pages 2279 - 2289, XP002900881 [A] 1-12 |