EP1128845 - COMBINATIONS COMPRISING A BETA-AGONIST AND A FURTHER ANTDIABETIC AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham plc 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARCH, Jonathan Robert Sanders, SmithKline Beecham Pharm., New Frontiers Science Park South Third Av. Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Rutter, Keith GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Rutter, Keith GlaxoSmithKline, Two New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99954217.8 | 11.11.1999 | [2001/36] | WO1999GB03755 | Priority number, date | GB19980024789 | 11.11.1998 Original published format: GB 9824789 | GB19980024791 | 11.11.1998 Original published format: GB 9824791 | GB19980024790 | 11.11.1998 Original published format: GB 9824790 | [2001/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0027434 | Date: | 18.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1128845 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61P3/10 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K31/70 (KR);
A61P3/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | 16.05.2001 | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONEN ENTHALTEND EINEN BETA-AGONIST UND WEITER ANTIDIABETISCHE SUBSTANZEN | [2001/36] | English: | COMBINATIONS COMPRISING A BETA-AGONIST AND A FURTHER ANTDIABETIC AGENT | [2001/36] | French: | COMBINAISONS COMPRENANT UN BETA-AGONISTE ET UN AUTRE AGENT ANTI-DIABETIQUE | [2001/36] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 11.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/48] | 21.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDY]WO9112003 (UPJOHN CO [US]) [XD] 1-18 * claim 7 * * page 2, lines 29-32 * [Y] 1-18; | [YD]EP0764640 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [YD] 1-18 * abstract *; | [DY]WO9725311 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al)[DY] 1-18; | [PYD]EP0882707 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [PYD] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [XY] - DAGOGO-JACK ET AL, "PATHOPHYSIOLOGY OF TYPE 2-DIABETES AND MODES OF ACTION OF THERAPEUTIC INTERVENTIONS", ARCHIVES OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, USA, (1997), vol. 157, no. 16, pages 1802 - 1817, XP000872498 [X] 1-18 * abstract * * page 1810, column R, line 44 - page 1811, column L, line 15 * [Y] 1-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/archinte.157.16.1802 |