EP1131851 - METHOD OF OPERATING A CHARGE COUPLED DEVICE IN AN ACCELERATED MODE, AND IN CONJUNCTION WITH AN OPTICAL SYMBOLOGY IMAGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microscan Systems, Inc. 1201 SW 7th Street Renton, WA 98057 / US | [2009/19] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc. 3333 Old Milton Parkway Alpharetta, GA 30005 / US | ||
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states Robotic Vision Systems Inc. 5 Shawmut Road Canton, MA 02021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STERN, Howard 89 Derby Avenue Greenlawn, NY 11740 / US | 02 /
DOWLING, John, H. 49 Windemere Way Nashua, NH 03063 / US | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Jones, Keith William, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Jones, Keith William, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2004/17] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Castles, 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2001/37] | Weatherald, Keith Baynes, et al Castles, 17 Lansdowne Road Croydon CR0 2BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99954592.4 | 10.09.1999 | [2001/37] | WO1999US18847 | Priority number, date | US19980151767 | 11.09.1998 Original published format: US 151767 | [2001/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0016401 | Date: | 23.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1131851 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/14, G06F13/36, H04N7/01 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
G06K7/10722 (EP,US);
H04N25/443 (EP,US);
H04N23/667 (EP,US);
H04N25/73 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, IE, NL, SE [2004/21] |
Former [2001/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | BETRIEBSWEISE EINES LADUNGSGEKOPPELTEN BAUELEMENTES IN EINEM BESCHLEUNIGUNGSMODUS UND VERBINDUNG MIT EINEM OPTISCHEN SYMBOLISCHEN BILDAUFNEHMER | [2001/37] | English: | METHOD OF OPERATING A CHARGE COUPLED DEVICE IN AN ACCELERATED MODE, AND IN CONJUNCTION WITH AN OPTICAL SYMBOLOGY IMAGER | [2001/37] | French: | METHODE D'UTILISATION D'UN DISPOSITIF A COUPLAGE DE CHARGE EN MODE ACCELERE ET EN LIAISON AVEC UN IMAGEUR OPTIQUE DE SYMBOLES | [2001/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 23.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/08] | 05.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   11.03.2005 | 30.09.2005 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2006 | 30.09.2006 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   10.10.2006 | 30.09.2007 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.2008 | 30.09.2010 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5434418 (SCHICK DAVID [US]) | International search | [Y]US4217611 (OGAWA MUTSUO [JP]); | [Y]US4774569 (MORTON ROGER R A [US], et al); | [Y]US4791469 (OHMI TADAHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]US4833722 (MORTON ROGER R A [US], et al); | [Y]US5128735 (OHMI TADAHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]US5210434 (OHMI TADAHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]US5239654 (ING-SIMMONS NICHOLAS K [GB], et al); | [Y]US5440342 (KANNEGUNDLA RAM [US]); | [Y]US5591955 (LASER VADIM [US]) |