EP1208123 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING POLYOLEFINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.2005 [2005/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport TN 37660 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORD, Randal, Ray 3013 Latonia Longview, TX 75605-1505 / US | 02 /
VANDERBILT, Jeffrey, James 1417 Rosedown Street Longview, TX 75604-3637 / US | 03 /
WHITFIELD, Roxanna, Lea 404 Twilight Court Longview, TX 75604-2120 / US | 04 /
MOORE, Glenn, Edward 110 Oak Isle Drive Longview, TX 75605-9292 / US | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99954975.1 | 14.10.1999 | [2002/22] | WO1999US24232 | Priority number, date | US19990387365 | 31.08.1999 Original published format: US 387365 | [2002/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0116191 | Date: | 08.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1208123 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1208123 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F10/02 (KR);
C08F2/34 (KR);
C08F4/602 (KR);
C08F4/6093 (KR);
C08F4/611 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F2/005 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/31] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYOLEFINE | [2002/22] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING POLYOLEFINS | [2002/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE POLYOLEFINES | [2002/22] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 05.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR1180416 (PETROCHEMICALS LTD) [X] 1-10,17-31,38-42 * page 3, line 116 - page 4, line 5; example 4 * [Y] 11-16,32-37; | [Y]EP0614917 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [Y] 11-16,32-37 * page 5, line 3 - page 5, line 18; examples 1,7 *; | [E]WO0024789 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [E] 1-42 * the whole document *; | [E]WO0024790 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [E] 1-42* the whole document * |