EP1083958 - ATRAUMATIC FLUID DELIVERY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TherOx, Inc. 2400 Michelson Drive Irvine, CA 92612-1310 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states Therox, Inc. 2400 Michelson Drive Irvine, CA 92612-1310 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIVINO, Vincent, Jr. 24436 Muela Mission Viejo, CA 92692 / US | 02 /
MERRITT, John 222 Barcelona San Clemente, CA 92672 / US | 03 /
FOERSTER, Seth, A. 758 Via Otono San Clemente, CA 92672 / US | 04 /
HOMET, William, C. 31608 Calle La Purisma San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675 / US | 05 /
ZALESKY, Paul, J. 20292 Harpoon Circle Huntington Beach, CA 92646 / US | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/12] | Brunner, Michael John GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99955229.2 | 04.06.1999 | [2001/12] | WO1999US12675 | Priority number, date | US19980092254 | 05.06.1998 Original published format: US 92254 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9962584 | Date: | 09.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1083958 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1083958 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/01 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
A61M25/0029 (EP,US);
A61M25/003 (EP,US);
A61M25/0043 (EP,US);
A61M25/09 (EP,US);
A61M31/005 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0039 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0057 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0073 (EP,US);
A61M2025/09083 (EP,US);
A61M2025/09091 (EP,US);
A61M2025/091 (EP,US);
A61M2025/09175 (EP,US);
A61M25/0068 (EP,US);
A61M25/0108 (EP,US);
A61M25/09033 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1062 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/12] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSAUSTRAGENDER FÜHRUNGSDRAHT | [2001/12] | English: | ATRAUMATIC FLUID DELIVERY DEVICES | [2001/12] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE DISTRIBUTION ATRAUMATIQUE DE FLUIDE | [2001/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 07.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]WO9749447 (THEROX INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10,13,14,16-18,21-23,26-29,31-35 * The Whole Document * [A] 24,25 [Y] 11,12,15,20,36; | [Y]WO9711735 (INTERVENTIONAL INNOVATIONS COR [US]) [Y] 11,20,36 * column A; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US5067489 (LIND STUART J [US]) [Y] 12 * column A; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0490459 (KENDALL & CO [US]) [Y] 15 * column A; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5322508 (VIERA FERNANDO M [US]); | [A]US5376083 (MISCHE HANS A [US]); | [A]US5569197 (HELMUS MICHAEL N [US], et al) | by applicant | US4964409 | US5322508 | US5407426 | US5599296 | US4793350 | US5087244 |