EP1084197 - A PARTICLE HAVING AN ATTACHED HALIDE GROUP AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION Two Seaport Lane Suite 1300 Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION Two Seaport Lane, Suite 1300 Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US | ||
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION Two Seaport Lane, Suite 1300 Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US | ||
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION 75 State Street Boston, MA 02109-1806 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEVONPORT, Wayne 246 Lancaster Drive Tewksbury, MA 01876 / US | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Trueman, Lucy Petra Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Trueman, Lucy Petra Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99955281.3 | 02.06.1999 | [2001/12] | WO1999US12283 | Priority number, date | US19980089263 | 03.06.1998 Original published format: US 89263 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9963007 | Date: | 09.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1084197 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1084197 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/56, C09C3/08, C09C3/10, C09C3/12 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
B60C1/00 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C08K9/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08K9/08 (EP,KR,US);
C09C1/56 (EP,KR,US);
C09C3/08 (EP,KR,US);
C09C3/10 (EP,KR,US);
C09C3/12 (EP,KR,US);
C09D11/324 (EP,KR,US);
G03G9/0904 (EP,KR,US);
G03G9/09716 (EP,US);
C01P2002/85 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2004/04 (EP,US);
C01P2004/50 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K9/04, C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08K9/08, C08L21/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/12] | Title | German: | TEILCHEN MIT GEBUNDENER HALOGENIDER GRUPPE UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2001/12] | English: | A PARTICLE HAVING AN ATTACHED HALIDE GROUP AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME | [2001/12] | French: | PARTICULE A GROUPE HALOGENURE ATTACHE ET PROCEDES D'ELABORATION | [2001/12] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 07.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2007 | BE | 24.01.2007 | CH | 24.01.2007 | CY | 24.01.2007 | DK | 24.01.2007 | FI | 24.01.2007 | LI | 24.01.2007 | NL | 24.01.2007 | SE | 24.04.2007 | GR | 25.04.2007 | ES | 05.05.2007 | LU | 02.06.2007 | IE | 05.06.2007 | PT | 25.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/25] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
IE | 05.06.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2030146 (UNION CARBIDE CORP) [A] 1-5,16* the whole document *; | [A]WO9618694 (CABOT CORP [US]) [A] 1-5 * claims 1-39 *; | [DA]WO9618688 (CABOT CORP [US]) [DA] 1 * page 98 - page 116 *; | [A]US5707432 (ADAMS CURTIS E [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5 * claim 11 * | Examination | - 'Silane Coupling Agents', Plueddemann E.P., (1982), Plenum Press, New York, p. 142 and p. 167-205 |