EP1140330 - WATER FILTRATION USING IMMERSED MEMBRANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Revocation of patent | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zenon Technology Partnership The Corporation Trust Company Corporation Trust Centre 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [2007/18] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states ZENON ENVIRONMENTAL INC. 3239 Dundas Street West Oakville, Ontario L6J 4Z3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COTE, Pierre 26 Tally-Ho Drive Dundas, Ontario L9H 3M6 / CA | 02 /
JANSON, Arnold 343 Rankin Drive Burlington, Ontario L7N 2B2 / CA | 03 /
HUSAIN, Hadi 88 Porteous Circle Brampton, Ontario L6S 5C5 / CA | 04 /
SINGH, Manwinder 1460 Ghent Avenue Burlington, Ontario L7S 1X7 / CA | 05 /
ADAMS, Nicholas 37 Kipling Road Hamilton, Ontario L8S 3X2 / CA | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [2014/39] |
Former [2014/36] | McCartney, Jonathan William Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2005/18] | Gibbs, Christopher Stephen, et al Haseltine Lake, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | ||
Former [2001/41] | Overbury, Richard Douglas Haseltine Lake & Co, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99955620.2 | 18.11.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999CA01113 | Priority number, date | US19980109520P | 23.11.1998 Original published format: US 109520 P | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0030742 | Date: | 02.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1140330 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1140330 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01D65/08, B01D61/22, C02F1/44 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
B01D65/08 (EP,US);
B01D61/145 (EP,US);
B01D61/146 (EP);
B01D61/147 (EP,US);
B01D61/149 (US);
B01D61/16 (EP,US);
B01D61/18 (EP,US);
B01D61/22 (EP,US);
B01D63/02 (EP);
B01D63/031 (US);
B01D63/043 (EP,US);
B01D65/02 (EP,US);
C02F1/444 (EP,US);
C02F3/1273 (EP,US);
B01D2311/04 (EP,US);
B01D2315/06 (EP,US);
B01D2321/04 (EP,US);
B01D2321/16 (EP);
B01D2321/167 (US);
B01D2321/185 (EP,US);
B01D2321/2066 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B01D2311/04, B01D2311/10, B01D2311/2661 (US,EP);
B01D2311/04, B01D2311/14, B01D2311/14 (US,EP);
B01D2311/04, B01D2311/2649 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERFILTRATION MITTELS UNTERWASSERMEMBRANEN | [2001/41] | English: | WATER FILTRATION USING IMMERSED MEMBRANES | [2001/41] | French: | FILTRAGE DE L'EAU AU MOYEN DE MEMBRANES IMMERGEES | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 14.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05006802.2 / EP1559472 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.2006
20.01.2006
WITHDRAWN Evoqua Water Technologies LLC 4800 North Point Parkway, Suite 250 Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/20] |
Former [2015/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.2006
20.01.2006
ADMISSIBLE Evoqua Water Technologies LLC 4800 North Point Parkway, Suite 250 Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US Opponent's representative Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.2006
20.01.2006
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Industry, Inc. 3333 Old Milton Parkway Alpharetta, GA 30005 / US Opponent's representative Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.2006
20.01.2006
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Industry, Inc. 3333 Old Milton Parkway Alpharetta, GA 30005 / US Opponent's representative FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2011/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.2006
20.01.2006
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Industry, Inc. 3333 Old Milton Parkway Alpharetta, GA 30005 / US Opponent's representative Weigelt, Udo Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.2006
20.01.2006
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Water Technologies Holding Corp. 181 Thorn Hill Road Warrendale, PA 15086 / US Opponent's representative Weigelt, Udo Grünecker, Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.2006
US Filter Corporation 78-080 Calle Estado Suite 201 La Quinta CA 92253 / US Opponent's representative Weigelt, Udo Grünecker, Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | 10.02.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.08.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.12.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 17.11.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/07] | Appeal following opposition | 15.02.2008 | Appeal received No. T0445/08 | 01.05.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.11.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | 30.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.10.2011 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | 26.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.04.2015 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.04.2005 | BE | 06.04.2005 | CH | 06.04.2005 | FI | 06.04.2005 | LI | 06.04.2005 | DK | 06.07.2005 | GR | 06.07.2005 | SE | 06.07.2005 | ES | 17.07.2005 | PT | 08.09.2005 | CY | 18.11.2005 | IE | 18.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | NL | 01.06.2006 | GB | 18.11.2013 | FR | 02.12.2013 | [2014/51] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
CY | 18.11.2005 | ||
IE | 18.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
IE | 18.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 06.04.2005 | |
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 06.07.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10286563 ; | JPH10286563 [ ]; | [A]JPH08257373 ; | [A]EP0655418 (OMNIUM TRAITEMENT VALORISA [FR]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9706880 (ZENON ENVIRONMENTAL INC [CA]) [A] 1,10,13,19,24 * abstract * * page 39, line 18 - page 19, line 24; figures 10,12,1314 *; | [A]WO9718887 (OMNIUM TRAITEMENT VALORISA [FR], et al) [A] 1,21,22,24,26-32 * page 17, line 18 - page 19, line 14; figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, & JP10286563 A 19981027 (NKK CORP) [A] 1-8,10,13,20,21 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 99, no. 03, Database accession no. 1999-027848, & JPH10286563 A 19981027 (NKK CORP) [ ] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08257373 A 19961008 (HITACHI ZOSEN CORP) [A] 1,8,10,13,19 * abstract * |