EP1133850 - BLOCK CIPHER SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/38] | A CIPHER | ||
[2009/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILCHEV, George 33 Elmers Lane Ipswich IP5 2GW / GB | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Semos, Robert Ernest Vickers, et al BT Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor BT Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Semos, Robert Ernest Vickers, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A, BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | ||
Former [2001/38] | Semos, Robert Ernest Vickers, et al BT Group Legal Services, Intellectual Property Department, 8th Floor, Holborn Centre 120 Holborn London EC1N 2TE / GB | Application number, filing date | 99956182.2 | 23.11.1999 | [2001/38] | WO1999GB03891 | Priority number, date | GB19980025644 | 23.11.1998 Original published format: GB 9825644 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0031916 | Date: | 02.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1133850 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1133850 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/06, H04L9/00 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
H04L9/0662 (EP,US);
H04L2209/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BLOCKVERSCHLÜSSELUNG | [2009/01] | English: | BLOCK CIPHER SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2009/01] | French: | APPAREIL ET METHODE DE CHIFFREMENT PAR BLOCS | [2009/01] |
Former [2001/38] | VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2001/38] | A CIPHER | ||
Former [2001/38] | APPAREIL DE CHIFFREMENT | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 27.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8907375 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1,12,13,23,34,41,53,54,63,75 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 30 * * page 6, line 1 - line 18 *; | [A]EP0267647 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1,23,41,63 * column 2, line L - column 3, line 13 * * column 4, line 1 - line 45 * * column 5, line 1 - line 28 *; | [A]JPH05102960 ; | [A]US4984271 (GOTO KENJIRO [JP]) [A] 1,23,41 * column A; figure 3 * | [A] - NANDI S ET AL, "THEORY AND APPLICATIONS OF CELLULAR AUTOMATA IN CRYPTOGRAPHY", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS, NEW YORK (US), (19941201), vol. 43, no. 12, pages 1346 - 1356, XP000484159 [A] 1,3,12,23,25,41,49,53,63,71 * abstract * * page 1348, column R, line 6 - line 34 * * page 1351, column R, paragraph L - page 1352, column L, line 16 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/12.338094 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930820), vol. 017, no. 456, Database accession no. (E - 1418), & JP05102960 A 19930423 (NEC CORP) [A] 7-10,28-31,45-48,67-70 * abstract * |