EP1135447 - WALL COVERINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Speciality Coatings Group Limited Moorside Mill, Dewhurst Street Darwen, Lancs BB3 2EN / GB | For all designated states Britton, William 207 Sycamore Hills Court Louisville, KY 40245 / US | [2001/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRITTON, William 207 Sycamore Hills Court Louisville, KY 40245 / US | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Mohun, Stephen John Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Mohun, Stephen John Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99956226.7 | 25.11.1999 | [2001/39] | WO1999GB03943 | Priority number, date | GB19980025950 | 26.11.1998 Original published format: GB 9825950 | GB19980025947 | 26.11.1998 Original published format: GB 9825947 | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0031201 | Date: | 02.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1135447 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02, B44C7/00, B32B27/10, B32B27/30, // B44C5/04 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
B32B27/10 (EP,US);
B32B27/00 (EP);
B32B27/30 (EP);
B32B27/304 (US);
B44C1/105 (EP);
C09J7/29 (EP,US);
B32B2255/12 (US);
B32B2255/26 (US);
B32B2307/7246 (US);
B32B2327/06 (US);
B32B2607/02 (US);
C09J2301/412 (EP);
C09J2400/283 (EP);
C09J2427/003 (EP);
C09J2427/006 (EP);
C09J2433/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WANDBEKLEIDUNGEN | [2001/39] | English: | WALL COVERINGS | [2001/39] | French: | REVETEMENTS MURAUX | [2001/39] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 09.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/48] | 23.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0224140 ; | [DXY]US3331729 (DANIELSON ALTON J, et al) [DX] 1,3,4,6,24-30,32,33,41,42,62 * figure 2 * * column 1, line 30 * * column 2, line 21 - line 28 * * column 3, line 3 - line 69 * * claim 10 * [Y] 7-13,45; | [X]NL6909174 (IMPERIAL CHEMICAL IND LTD) [X] 47,48,50,53,56-59,61,63 * claims 1-5 * * page 4, line 5 - line 9 * * example - *; | [X]DD154437 (HEIDEMARIE REICHMANN, et al) [X] 56-59,63 * abstract * * example 1 *; | [DXA]US5441784 (SMITH JOHN R [US]) [DX] 47,48,50,53,56,57,61 * figure . * * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 64 * * example 1 * [A] 6-23,62; | [DYX]US5639539 (DEPROSPERO DAVID A [US], et al) [DY] 7-13,45 * figures 1,3 * * column 2, line 45 - column 5, line 36 * * column 2, line 45 - column 4, line 17 * * claim 13 * [X] 56,57,59,61,63; | [DX]WO9820086 (QUESTEL JOHN M [US], et al) [DX] 1,2,4-6,9,24-30,32,33,35,41,42,45,46,62 * figure 1 * * page 3, line 17 - line 33 * * page 4, line 31 - page 6, line 19 * * page 6, line 31 - line 33 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 10, Database accession no. 1990-071265, XP002137723 & JPH0224140 A 19900126 (SHINETSU CHEM IND CO LTD) [X] 47,48,51-53,56,57,61 * abstract * |