EP1123374 - FABRIC CARE COMPOSITION AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [2001/33] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARNABAS, Mary, Vijayarani 5777 Sawgrass Drive West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 02 /
TRINH, Toan 8671 Creekwood Lane Maineville, OH 45039 / US | 03 /
BARNABAS, Freddy, Arthur 5777 Sawgrass Drive West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 04 /
SHOWELL, Michael, Stanford 810 Finney Trail Cincinnati, OH 45224 / US | 05 /
SINE, Mark, Richard 2631 East U.S. 22 and 3 Morrow, OH 45152 / US | 06 /
SMETS, Johan Bollenberg 79 B-3210 Lubbeek / BE | 07 /
TORDIL, Helen, Bernardo 7590 West Chester Road West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 08 /
WERNICKE, Todd, Michael 8706 Tanagerwoods Drive Cincinnati, OH 45249 / US | [2001/33] | Representative(s) | Engisch, Gautier, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | Engisch, Gautier, et al BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe SPRL, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 99956654.0 | 22.10.1999 | [2001/33] | WO1999US24942 | Priority number, date | US19980105375P | 23.10.1998 Original published format: US 105375 P | [2001/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0024856 | Date: | 04.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1123374 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1123374 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/22, C11D7/26 | [2001/33] | CPC: |
C11D3/3738 (EP);
D06M15/00 (KR);
C11D17/041 (EP);
C11D3/0015 (EP);
C11D3/046 (EP);
C11D3/162 (EP);
C11D3/221 (EP);
C11D3/222 (EP);
C11D3/362 (EP);
C11D3/373 (EP);
C11D3/3757 (EP);
C11D3/3769 (EP);
D06M15/03 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2005/36] |
Former [2001/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR TEXTILPFLEGE | [2001/33] | English: | FABRIC CARE COMPOSITION AND METHOD | [2001/33] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ENTRETIEN DES TEXTILES ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT | [2001/33] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 04.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Request for further processing for: | 29.01.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 29.01.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.02.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.12.2005 | BE | 28.12.2005 | CH | 28.12.2005 | CY | 28.12.2005 | FI | 28.12.2005 | IT | 28.12.2005 | LI | 28.12.2005 | NL | 28.12.2005 | DK | 28.03.2006 | GR | 28.03.2006 | ES | 08.04.2006 | PT | 29.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/18] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
IT | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 28.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH06184943 ; | [X]JPH06116586 ; | [A]JPH05209195 ; | [A]US3600325 (KAUFMAN KARL L, et al) [A] 1,35,44-46,51,52,64,66-72,74,89 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4169064 (SAGEL JOHN A, et al) [A] 1-5,35,39,40,44,45,51,52,54,60,64,66-72,79,89,94 * abstract *; | [X]WO9115564 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-5,35,39,40,44,45,51-53,60,64-73,79,89-93 * abstract *; | [A]WO9534625 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-4,12,14,15,18,35,39,40,44,45,51,52,60,64,66-72,89-93 * page 6, line 8 - line 9; example III; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9604937 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,12,14,15,34,35,44-46,48,51,52,64,66-72,74,89-91,93 * abstract * * page 33, line 5 - line 29 *; | [X]EP0703243 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-5,35,39,40,44,45,51-53,60,64-72,79,89-93 * page 2, line 51 - line 55; claim 6 *; | [A]WO9615310 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,19-30,35,44-46,48,51,52,54,64,66-72,74-76,78,89 * claims 1-6,9 *; | [A]WO9621714 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,34-38,44,45,51,52,61,64,66-72,82,83,93 * abstract *; | [A]WO9741292 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1,35,41-45,51,52,56,62,64,66-72,84,86-88,95 * claims 19-21 *; | [A]WO9745510 (SALIENT SCIENCE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-4,35,39,40,44,45,51,52,60,64,66-69,93 * abstract *; | [E]WO9955736 (LAREX INC [US]) [E] 1,4,5,7-11,44,45,61,64,66-71,89-93 * page 9, line 3 - line 10 * * page 16, line 9 - line 14; claim 1 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941011), vol. 018, no. 533, Database accession no. (C - 1259), & JP06184943 A 19940705 (SHIN ETSU CHEM CO LTD) [X] 1,4,5,35,64,66-72,80,89-93 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 21, Database accession no. 1994-174016, XP002131387 & JPH06116586 A 19940426 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND CO) [X] 1,4,7,35,44,45,51,52,64,66-72,89-93 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 38, Database accession no. 1993-297903, XP002131388 & JPH05209195 A 19930820 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [A] 1,4,7-9,35 * abstract * |