EP1071447 - Gastrin for use in the treatment of diabetes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/05] | TREATMENT FOR DIABETES | ||
[2009/09] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WARATAH PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 1000 Chemin du Golf Iles des Soeurs Verdun, Quebec / CA | For all designated states THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states WARATAH PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 1000 Chemin du Golf Iles des Soeurs Verdun, Quebec / CA | ||
For all designated states THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARIKH, Indu 2558 Booker Creek Road Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | 02 /
LANE, Anne, UCL Ventures Brooks House, 2-16 Torrington Place London WC1E 1HN / GB | 03 /
NARDI, Ronald, V. 32 Hutton Drive Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US | 04 /
BRAND, Stephen, J. 161 Bedford Road Lincoln, MA 01773 / US | [2001/31] |
Former [2001/05] | 01 /
PARIKH, Indu 2558 Booker Creek Road Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | ||
02 /
LANE, Anne 266 Lansdowne Road Westmount, Quebec H3Z 2L3 / CA | |||
03 /
NARDI, Ronald, V. 32 Hutton Drive Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US | |||
04 /
BRAND, Stephen, J. 161 Bedford Road Lincoln, MA 01773 / US | Representative(s) | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2006/25] | Holliday, Louise Caroline, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2006/19] | Richards, William John, et al D. Young & Co. Briton House Briton Street GB-Southampton S014 3EB / GB | ||
Former [2001/05] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99956786.0 | 27.10.1999 | [2001/05] | WO1999US25463 | Priority number, date | US19990241100 | 29.01.1999 Original published format: US 241100 | [2001/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0044400 | Date: | 03.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1071447 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/22, A61K35/39, A61P5/48 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
C07K14/495 (EP,SE,US);
A61K38/18 (SE);
A61K38/27 (KR);
A61K38/1841 (SE);
A61K38/2207 (EP,SE,US);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/48 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/2207, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/2207, A61K38/1808 (EP,US);
A61K38/2207, A61K38/1841 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/05] | A61K38/22, A61K35/39, A61P5/48, // A61K38:22, A61K38:18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/05] | Title | German: | Gastrin zur Behandlung von Diabetes | [2009/09] | English: | Gastrin for use in the treatment of diabetes | [2009/09] | French: | Gastrine pour traitement du diabete | [2009/09] |
Former [2001/05] | DIABETESBEHANDLUNG | ||
Former [2001/05] | TREATMENT FOR DIABETES | ||
Former [2001/05] | TRAITEMENT DU DIABETE | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 06.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/46] | 28.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9202246 (PARIKH INDU [US]); | [X]WO9519785 (RES TRIANGLE PHARM LTD [US]); |