EP1126910 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING ETHER-CAPPED POLY(OXYALKYLATED) ALCOHOL SURFACTANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JORDAN, Glenn, Thomas, IV 5750 Ridgeview Drive Indian Springs, OH 45011 / US | 02 /
LEVENGOOD, Donald, Eugene 7967 Kingsgate Way West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 03 /
SIVIK, Mark, Robert 2434 Sheffield Court Ft. Mitchell, KY 41017 / US | 04 /
KLUESENER, Bernard, William 11619 New Biddinger Road Harrison, OH 45030 / US | 05 /
FORMYDUVAL, Terry, Franklin 8119 Fields-Ertel Road Cincinnati, OH 45249 / US | 06 /
MILLER, Larry, Eugene 6919 Stonewood Court Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | 07 /
BACK, Deborah, Jean 7189 State Route 128 Cleves, OH 45002 / US | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | ||
Former [2004/22] | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Patent Dept., Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 9TS / GB | ||
Former [2001/35] | Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99956901.5 | 03.11.1999 | [2001/35] | WO1999US25943 | Priority number, date | US19980107170P | 05.11.1998 Original published format: US 107170 P | US19990131410P | 28.04.1999 Original published format: US 131410 P | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0027516 | Date: | 18.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1126910 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01F17/00, C11D1/72 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
C08G65/22 (EP,US);
C09K23/42 (EP,US);
C08G65/2609 (EP,US);
C09K23/00 (EP,US);
C11D1/721 (EP,US);
C08G2650/06 (EP,US);
C08G2650/34 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERKAPPTEN POLY(OXYALKYL)ALKOHOLTENSIDEN | [2001/35] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING ETHER-CAPPED POLY(OXYALKYLATED) ALCOHOL SURFACTANTS | [2001/35] | French: | PREPARATION DE TENSIOACTIFS A BASE D'ALCOOLS POLY(OXYALKYLES) A PROTECTIONS ETHER | [2001/35] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 28.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/14] | 04.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2225318 (BASF AG) [A] * claims 1-3 *; | [A]US4978805 (BAUR RICHARD [DE], et al) [A] * claims 1-4 *; | [DA]US5294365 (WELCH MICHAEL C [US], et al) [DA] * claims 1-10 *; | [DA]WO9722651 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [DA] * claims 1-10 *; | [A]WO9811185 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] * claims 1-13 *; | [PX]WO9906468 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [PX] 1 * claims 1-10 *; | [PX]WO9906467 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [PX] 1 * claims 1-10 *; | [PX]WO9906466 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [PX] 1 * claims 1-14 * |