EP1126886 - VENTRICULAR ASSIST DEVICE WITH PRE-FORMED INFLATION BLADDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cardio Technologies, Inc. Route 46E, Montville Business Center, Bldg. No. 43 Pine Brook, NJ 07058 / US | [2001/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EASTERBROOK, William, A., III 43 Newark Avenue Westwood, NJ 07675 / US | 02 /
STROMAN, Michael Plainfield, NJ Plainfield, NJ / US | 03 /
HOWANSKY, Mark S. Apartment 1505, 100 Manhattan Avenue Union City, NJ 07928 / US | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Greene, Simon Kenneth, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99956912.2 | 04.11.1999 | [2001/35] | WO1999US26042 | Priority number, date | US19980107014P | 04.11.1998 Original published format: US 107014 P | US19980107016P | 04.11.1998 Original published format: US 107016 P | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0025842 | Date: | 11.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1126886 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.05.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/10, A47C27/10, B29C69/00 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
A61M60/289 (EP,US);
A61M60/191 (EP,US);
A61M60/468 (EP,US);
A61M60/839 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/35] | A61M1/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERZKAMMERUNTERSTÜTZUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT VORGEFORMTER AUFBLASBARER HÜLLE | [2001/35] | English: | VENTRICULAR ASSIST DEVICE WITH PRE-FORMED INFLATION BLADDER | [2001/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ASSISTANCE VENTRICULAIRE A VESSIE GONFLABLE PREFORMEE | [2001/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2001 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 03.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/50] | 09.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3371662 (JOZSEF HEID, et al) [Y] 5-10 * column 1 - column 2; figures 1,2; claim 2 *; | [X]US4130617 (WALLACE DEAN R) [X] 21-23 * column 3, lines 39-41 - column 5; figures 6,9 *; | [XY]US5119804 (ANSTADT GEORGE L [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, lines 37-46 - column 5, lines 2-5,30-35,46-50,55-62; figures 5,6,10 * [Y] 5-10; | [A]US5596781 (GRAEBE ROBERT H [US]) [A] 21-23* column 4, lines 36-57 - column 5, lines 29-43; figures 11,19 *; | [E]WO9855165 (WOODARD JOHN C [AU], et al) [E] 1-3,5-10 * page 14, line 3-14 - page 33, line 22-26 - page 34, line 5-9 - page 40, line 16-27 *; page 4, lines 11-77 - page 13, lines 18-25; figures 2,6,11,12,14 * | International search | [X]US3613672 (SCHIFF PETER); | [X]US5169381 (SNYDERS ROBERT V [US]) |