EP1140953 - METHOD OF PURIFYING THIAMINE PHOSPHATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRUMMRADT, Holger Odenwaldstrasse 21 D-64319 Pfungstadt / DE | 02 /
BESCHMANN, Klaus Hinter der Mühle 15 D-64354 Reinheim / DE | 03 /
WARTENBERG, Frank-Hardi Liebfrauenstrasse 107 D-64289 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
DIEKMANN, Horst Unter den Golläckern 6 D-64295 Darmstadt / DE | [2001/41] | Application number, filing date | 99957313.2 | 17.11.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999EP08822 | Priority number, date | DE1998158269 | 17.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19858269 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0035927 | Date: | 22.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1140953 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1140953 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/6558 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
C07F9/025 (EP,US);
C07F9/6539 (KR);
C07F9/65583 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON THIAMINPHOSPHATEN | [2001/41] | English: | METHOD OF PURIFYING THIAMINE PHOSPHATES | [2001/41] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PURIFIER DES PHOSPHATES DE THIAMINE | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 15.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 22.01.2003 | GR | 22.01.2003 | IE | 22.01.2003 | DK | 22.04.2003 | PT | 22.04.2003 | SE | 22.04.2003 | ES | 30.07.2003 | [2004/05] |
Former [2004/03] | FI | 22.01.2003 | |
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
IE | 22.01.2003 | ||
DK | 22.04.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 22.01.2003 | |
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 22.01.2003 | |
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 22.01.2003 | |
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 22.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DA]GB793753 (ISTITUTO SIEROTERAPICO ITALIAN) [DA] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE1085527 (MERCK AG E) [DA] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE2056076 (RAFFINAGE CIE FRANCAISE); | JPS5064485 [ ] (TANABE SEIYAKU CO., LTD.;JAPAN); | [DA]EP0385379 (BASF AG [DE]) [DA] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A] - MUSHIKA Y, "Cocarboxylase", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19750929), vol. 083, no. 13, Database accession no. 112410, XP002131564 [A] 1-5 * abstract * |