EP1054297 - PHOTORESIST STRIPPER AND METHOD OF STRIPPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AZ Electronic Materials USA Corp. 70 Meister Avenue Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | [2005/06] |
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states Clariant Finance (BVI) Limited Citco Building, Wickhams Cay Road Town, Tortola / VG | ||
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd. Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz 1 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEDA, Takashi Clariant (Japan) K.K. 3810, Chihama Daitocho Ogasa-gun Shizuoka 437-1496 / JP | 02 /
ARANO, Akio Daisan Monseribah 201, 18-8, Segawa 2-chome Minoo-shi, Osaka 562-0045 / JP | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2005/06] | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn, Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2000/47] | Hütter, Klaus, Dr., et al Clariant GmbH Patente, Marken, Lizenzen Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 99957400.7 | 01.12.1999 | [2000/47] | WO1999JP06728 | Priority number, date | JP19980344089 | 03.12.1998 Original published format: JP 34408998 | [2000/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0033139 | Date: | 08.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1054297 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.06.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/42, H01L21/027 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
G03F7/425 (EP,KR);
G03F7/0392 (KR);
G03F7/091 (KR);
G03F7/34 (KR);
G03F7/422 (KR);
G03F7/426 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/47] | Title | German: | PHOTORESISTENTSCHICHTUNGSMITTEL UND ENTSCHICHTUNGSVERFAHREN | [2000/47] | English: | PHOTORESIST STRIPPER AND METHOD OF STRIPPING | [2000/47] | French: | AGENT DE DECOLLEMENT DE PHOTORESIST, ET PROCEDE DE DECOLLEMENT ASSOCIE | [2000/47] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2000 | Translation filed | 04.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 22.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/34] | 01.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]DE3828513 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [A]JPH06250405 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JPS491444 |