EP1135119 - GLUCOSE AND LIPID LOWERING COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALTEON, INC. 170 Williams Drive Ramsey New Jersey 07446 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states ALTEON Inc. 170 Williams Drive Ramsey, New Jersey 07446 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGLE, Dilip Apt. 7L, Jeanne Marie Gardens, James Drive Nanuet, NY 10954 / US | 02 /
FANG, Sheng, Ding 391 Franklin Turnpike Mahwah, NJ / US | 03 /
TERLECKYJ, Ihor 15 Darling Avenue Bloomfield, NJ 07003-5405 / US | 04 /
RESEK, John 248 Henry Street Brooklyn, NY 11201 / US | 05 /
EGAN, Jack Apartment 6-D, 169 East 69th Street New York, NY 10021 / US | [2001/45] |
Former [2001/39] | 01 /
WAGLE, Dilip Apt. 7L, Jeanne Marie Gardens, James Drive Nanuet, NY 10954 / US | ||
02 /
FANG, Sheng, Ding 391 Franklin Turnpike Mahwah, NJ / US | |||
03 /
TERLECKYJ, Ihor 333 East Ridgewood Avenue Ridgewood, NJ 07450 / US | |||
04 /
RESEK, John 248 Henry Street Brooklyn, NY 11201 / US | |||
05 /
EGAN, Jack Apartment 6-D, 169 East 69th Street New York, NY 10021 / US | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9, Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | ||
Former [2001/39] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99957542.6 | 10.11.1999 | [2001/39] | WO1999US26563 | Priority number, date | US19980190507 | 12.11.1998 Original published format: US 190507 | US19980197352 | 20.11.1998 Original published format: US 197352 | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0027388 | Date: | 18.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1135119 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.05.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/27, A61K31/215 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
A61K31/343 (EP);
A61K31/365 (KR);
A61K31/4025 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
C07D307/92 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLUKOSE- UND LIPIDSENKENDE VERBINDUNGEN | [2001/39] | English: | GLUCOSE AND LIPID LOWERING COMPOUNDS | [2001/39] | French: | COMPOSES HYPOGLYCEMIANTS ET HYPOLIPEMIANTS | [2001/39] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2001 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 04.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/27] | 21.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0597107 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]) | International search | [AP]US5917084 (JIANG ZHI-DONG [US]) |