EP1131656 - COATED LENS TO REDUCE VISUAL PERCEPTION OF STAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2003 | Refusal of application | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLA INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS, LTD. Sherriffs Road Lonsdale South Australia 5160 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states SOLA INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS, LTD. Sherriffs Road Lonsdale, South Australia 5160 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YIP, Brandon Unit 3 Stirling Road Blackwood, S.A. 5051 / AU | 02 /
ADAMS, Brian, Douglas 39 Darwendale Street Huntfield Heights, S.A. 5163 / AU | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Stevens, Jason Paul, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | Stevens, Jason Paul, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99957744.8 | 18.11.1999 | [2001/37] | WO1999AU01025 | Priority number, date | AU1998PP07236 | 20.11.1998 Original published format: AU PP723698 | [2001/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0031569 | Date: | 02.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1131656 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 02.06.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/11, G02B1/10, B05D5/06 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
G02B27/0006 (EP);
G02B1/10 (EP);
G02B1/11 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/37] | G02B1/11, G02B1/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/37] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETE LINSE ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER WAHRNEHMUNG VON FLECKEN | [2001/37] | English: | COATED LENS TO REDUCE VISUAL PERCEPTION OF STAINS | [2001/37] | French: | LENTILLE PORTANT UN REVETEMENT DE FA ON A REDUIRE LA PERCEPTION DES TACHES | [2001/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2001 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 04.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 04.05.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 31.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.03.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2003/38] | 23.04.2003 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1045435 ; | [A]WO9517303 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-48* page 9, line 1 - line 5; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 06, & JP10045435 A 19980217 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-48 * abstract * | International search | [X]US4070097 (GELBER ROBERT M); | [A]US4387960 (TANI HAKUZO [JP]); | [A]US5460888 (HASHIMOTO SIGERU [JP], et al); | [A]US5725959 (TERADA JUNJI [JP], et al); | [A]US5729323 (ARDEN AMY J [US], et al); | [XP]US5847876 (FERRANTE RONALD A [US], et al) |