EP1144187 - MULTI-LAYER COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coronor Composites GmbH Woltorfer Strasse 124 31224 Peine / DE | [2006/48] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states Coronor Composites GmbH Woltorfer Strasse 124 31224 Peine / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOICH, Heinz-Horst Kastanienallee 7a D-31224 Peine / DE | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Schulz, Björn Maxton Langmaack & Partner Postfach 51 08 06 50944 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | Schulz, Björn Maxton Langmaack & Partner Postfach 51 08 08 50944 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2002/48] | Schulz, Björn Patentanwalt, c/o Corovin GmbH, Woltorfer Strasse 124 31224 Peine / DE | ||
Former [2001/42] | Patentanwälte Thömen & Körner Postfach 59 31 30059 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 99957923.8 | 20.10.1999 | [2001/42] | WO1999DE03359 | Priority number, date | DE1998151667 | 10.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19851667 | [2001/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0027626 | Date: | 18.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1144187 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1144187 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/04, B32B5/24, D04H1/54, D04H13/00, A61F13/515 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B29C65/02 (EP,US);
B29C65/18 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/21 (EP,US);
B29C66/43 (EP,US);
B29C66/727 (EP,US);
B29C66/7294 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/81422 (EP,US);
B29C66/83411 (EP,US);
B32B37/0076 (EP,US);
B32B7/04 (US);
D04H13/00 (EP,US);
D04H5/10 (EP,US);
B29C65/08 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/83511 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0854 (EP,US);
B29L2009/00 (EP,US);
B32B2262/02 (US);
B32B2305/20 (EP,US);
B32B2307/718 (US);
Y10T156/1023 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1039 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1737 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24603 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2021/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2075/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2001/42] | B32B7/04, B32B5/24, D04H1/54, D04H13/00, // A61F13:46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Extension states | RO | 04.04.2001 | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGES VERBUNDMATERIAL | [2001/42] | English: | MULTI-LAYER COMPOSITE MATERIAL | [2001/42] | French: | MATERIAU COMPOSITE MULTICOUCHE | [2001/42] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 26.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.11.2006 | FI | 29.11.2006 | GB | 29.11.2006 | IE | 29.11.2006 | IT | 29.11.2006 | NL | 29.11.2006 | DK | 28.02.2007 | SE | 28.02.2007 | GR | 01.03.2007 | ES | 12.03.2007 | PT | 30.04.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/21] | FI | 29.11.2006 | |
GB | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | FI | 29.11.2006 | |
GB | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/31] | FI | 29.11.2006 | |
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4761322 (RALEY JOHN M [US]) [X] 1-5,8-17 * column 7, line 37 - column 9, line 16 * * figure 2 * [A] 18,26,27; | [X]EP0374910 (STEEN & CO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5 * page 4, column 5, line 30 - page 5, column 7, line 38; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0466563 (PICARDIE LAINIERE [FR]) [A] 18 * page 3, column 4, line 57 - page 4, column 5, line 39 * * figure 2; claim 8 *; | [XA]EP0596532 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-5,8-17 * page 2, line 37 - line 48 * * page 3, line 17 - line 37 * * page 5, line 9 - line 58 * * page 6, line 8 - line 43 * * page 7, line 15 - line 44 * * page 8, line 36 - line 41 * [A] 18; | [A]EP0604731 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1,18,21,26,27 * page 3, line 3 - line 39 * * page 5, line 19 - line 50 ** claims 1,12-14 *; | [XA]DE19523497 (CORONOR COMPOSITES GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5 * figure 3A * * column 2, line 48 - line 62 * [A] 26,27 |