EP1069881 - DEVICE FOR REANIMATING PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM CARDIAC ARREST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sessler, Stefan Bitzer Weg 7 72474 Winterlingen / DE | [2001/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Möbus, Daniela Patentanwältin Kaiserstrasse 85 72764 Reutlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | Möbus, Daniela, Dr.-Ing. Hindenburgstrasse 65 72762 Reutlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99958053.3 | 16.11.1999 | [2001/04] | WO1999EP08810 | Priority number, date | DE1998157421 | 12.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19857421 | [2001/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0035404 | Date: | 22.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1069881 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1069881 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61H31/00, A61M16/00 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
A61M16/0075 (EP,US);
A61H31/007 (EP,US);
A61M16/0084 (EP,US);
A61H2031/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/35] |
Former [2001/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR WIEDERBELEBUNG VON PATIENTEN MIT HERZSTILLSTAND | [2001/04] | English: | DEVICE FOR REANIMATING PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM CARDIAC ARREST | [2001/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR REANIMER DES PATIENTS VICTIMES D'ARRET CARDIAQUE | [2001/04] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 21.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]FR1331573 (GODEL EDOUARD P V R) [Y] 3,12,18,19 * page 1, column 2, line 8 - page 2, column 1, line 22; figures 1-5 * * page 2, column 2, paragraph L - page 3, column 2, line 10 * * page 3, column 2, line 44 - line 52 * [A] 1,11,13; | [A]US3425409 (ISAACSON MAX, et al) [A] 3,10-12,19,21,24 * the whole document *; | [XAY]US3489140 (MULLIKIN WILBUR J) [X] 1,4,9,10,14,15,20,22,23 * column 1, line 47 - line 57; figure 1 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 51; figure 13 * * column 5, line 4 - line 15 * * column 6, line 24 - line 47 * [A] 2,5,25 [Y] 3,12,18,19; | [XA]US3512522 (GREENLEE MALCOLM B, et al) [X] 1,3-5,9,10,14,20,22 * column 2, line 38 - line 46; figure 2 * * column 3, line 40 - line 46; figure 1 * * column 4, line 17 - line 37 * * column 6, line 12 - line 24 * [A] 8,18; | [A]DE2521121 (RAGAILLER) [A] 2,6,8,10,11,14-17,19,20 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2382889 (BLOCH LAROQUE PAUL [FR]) [A] 3,10,12,13,16,26 * page 4, line 5 - line 33 ** page 2, line 7 - page 3, line 5 *; | [A]US5257619 (EVERETT RANDALL L [US]) [A] 2,5,6,20,22 * the whole document *; | [A]US5327887 (NOWAKOWSKI LUDWIK [CA]) [A] 10,12,16,17,21,24 * column 7, line 14 - column 9, line 17 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 23 * |