EP1153062 - POROUS POLYMETHYLSILSESQUIOXANE WITH ADSORBENT PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firmenich SA 1, route des Jeunes Case Postale 239 1211 Genève 8 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states FIRMENICH SA 1, route des Jeunes Case Postale 239 1211 Genève 8 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIMOUN, Hubert Route du Stade F-01630 Challex / FR | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Salvaterra-Garcia, Maria de Lurdes Firmenich SA Département des Brevets Case Postale 239 1211 Genève 8 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Salvaterra-Garcia, Maria de Lurdes, Dr. Firmenich SA, 1, route des Jeunes 1211 Genève 8 / CH | Application number, filing date | 99958439.4 | 16.12.1999 | [2001/46] | WO1999IB02019 | Priority number, date | CH19980002533 | 22.12.1998 Original published format: CH 253398 | [2001/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0037540 | Date: | 29.06.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1153062 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1153062 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/06, C12N11/08, A61K7/48, C11D3/37 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
A61Q13/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/0279 (EP,US);
A61K8/891 (EP,US);
B01J20/262 (EP,US);
B01J20/285 (EP,US);
C08J3/12 (EP,US);
C11D3/373 (EP,US);
C11D3/38681 (EP,US);
A61K2800/56 (EP,US);
C08J2383/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/46] | C08G77/06, C12N11/08, A61K7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/46] | Title | German: | PORÖSE POLYMETHYLSILSESQUIOXANE MIT ADSORBIERENDEN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2001/46] | English: | POROUS POLYMETHYLSILSESQUIOXANE WITH ADSORBENT PROPERTIES | [2001/46] | French: | POLYMETHYLSILSESQUIOXANE POREUX AYANT DES PROPRIETES ADSORBANTES | [2001/46] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 22.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.11.2002 | FI | 27.11.2002 | GR | 27.11.2002 | IE | 27.11.2002 | IT | 27.11.2002 | NL | 27.11.2002 | LU | 16.12.2002 | BE | 31.12.2002 | CY | 31.12.2002 | DK | 27.02.2003 | PT | 27.02.2003 | SE | 27.02.2003 | MC | 01.07.2003 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/31] | AT | 27.11.2002 | |
FI | 27.11.2002 | ||
GR | 27.11.2002 | ||
IE | 27.11.2002 | ||
NL | 27.11.2002 | ||
LU | 16.12.2002 | ||
BE | 31.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
DK | 27.02.2003 | ||
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
MC | 01.07.2003 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 27.11.2002 | |
FI | 27.11.2002 | ||
GR | 27.11.2002 | ||
IE | 27.11.2002 | ||
NL | 27.11.2002 | ||
BE | 31.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
DK | 27.02.2003 | ||
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
MC | 01.07.2003 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 27.11.2002 | |
FI | 27.11.2002 | ||
GR | 27.11.2002 | ||
IE | 27.11.2002 | ||
NL | 27.11.2002 | ||
BE | 31.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
MC | 01.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/18] | AT | 27.11.2002 | |
FI | 27.11.2002 | ||
GR | 27.11.2002 | ||
IE | 27.11.2002 | ||
NL | 27.11.2002 | ||
BE | 31.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
LU | 27.01.2003 | ||
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 27.11.2002 | |
FI | 27.11.2002 | ||
GR | 27.11.2002 | ||
IE | 27.11.2002 | ||
NL | 27.11.2002 | ||
BE | 31.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 27.11.2002 | |
FI | 27.11.2002 | ||
GR | 27.11.2002 | ||
IE | 27.11.2002 | ||
NL | 27.11.2002 | ||
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/42] | AT | 27.11.2002 | |
GR | 27.11.2002 | ||
IE | 27.11.2002 | ||
NL | 27.11.2002 | ||
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 27.11.2002 | |
GR | 27.11.2002 | ||
NL | 27.11.2002 | ||
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 27.11.2002 | |
NL | 27.11.2002 | ||
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 27.11.2002 | |
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 27.02.2003 | |
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/19] | SE | 27.02.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH06157759 ; | [A]EP0293795 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-32* claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP0406911 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-19 * claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940909), vol. 018, no. 485, Database accession no. (C - 1248), & JP06157759 A 19940607 (TOKUYAMA SODA CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * abstract * |