EP1126784 - SYSTEM FOR MAGNETIC-RESONANCE-GUIDED ELECTROPHYSIOLOGIC AND ABLATION PROCEDURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/35] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MAGNETIC-RESONANCE-GUIDED ELECTROPHYSIOLOGIC AND ABLATION PROCEDURES | ||
[2012/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The John Hopkins University Suite 906 111 Market Place Baltimore, MD 21201 / US | [2013/03] |
Former [2011/33] | For all designated states The John Hopkins University Suite 906 111 Market Place Baltimore, MD 21201 / US | ||
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states The Johns Hopkins University Suite 906, 111 Market Place Baltimore, MD 21202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALPERIN, Henry, R. 7708 Crossland Road Baltimore, MD 21208 / US | 02 /
BERGER, Ronald, D. 3101 Northbrook Road Pikesville, MD 21208 / US | 03 /
ATALAR, Ergin 5206 Wood Stove Road Columbia, MD 21045 / US | 04 /
MCVEIGH, Elliot, R. 213 Brackenwood Court Timonium, MD 21093 / US | 05 /
LARDO, Albert 12 Manor Knoll Court Baldwin, MD 21013 / US | 06 /
CALKINS, Hugh 109 Longwood Road Baltimore, MD 21210 / US | 07 /
LIMA, Joao 1 Maymont Court Timonium, MD 21093 / US | [2012/41] |
Former [2001/35] | 01 /
HALPERIN, Henry, R. 7708 Crossland Road Baltimore MD 21208 / US | ||
02 /
BERGER, Ronald, D. 3101 Northbrook Road PikesvilleMD 21208 / US | |||
03 /
ATALAR, Ergin 5206 Wood Stove Road Columbia MD 21045 / US | |||
04 /
MCVEIGH, Elliot, R. 213 Brackenwood Court Timonium MD 21093 / US | |||
05 /
LARDO, Albert 12 Manor Knoll Court Baldwin MD 21013 / US | |||
06 /
CALKINS, Hugh 109 Longwood Road Baltimore MD 21210 / US | |||
07 /
LIMA, Joao 1 Maymont Court Timonium, MD 21093 / US | Representative(s) | Barton, Matthew Thomas, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Barton, Matthew Thomas, et al Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/13] | Barton, Matthew Thomas, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/52] | Barton, Matthew Thomas, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/08] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2001/35] | Howden, Christopher Andrew FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99958755.3 | 04.11.1999 | [2001/35] | WO1999US25858 | Priority number, date | US19980106965P | 04.11.1998 Original published format: US 106965 P | US19990428990 | 29.10.1999 Original published format: US 428990 | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0025672 | Date: | 11.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1126784 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1126784 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.05.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/055, A61B18/14, G01R33/28, G01R33/34, A61B19/00 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (EP,US);
A61B5/415 (EP,US);
A61B5/418 (EP,US);
A61B90/36 (EP,US);
G01R33/285 (EP,US);
G01R33/34084 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00039 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00053 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/35] | A61B5/055 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/35] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR MAGNETRESONANZGEFÜHRTE ELEKTROPHYSIOLOGIE- UND ABLATIONSVERFAHREN | [2013/02] | English: | SYSTEM FOR MAGNETIC-RESONANCE-GUIDED ELECTROPHYSIOLOGIC AND ABLATION PROCEDURES | [2013/02] | French: | SYSTÈME PERMETTANT D'EXECUTER DES PROCÉDURES D'ABLATION ET D'ÉLECTROPHYSIOLOGIE GUIDÉES PAR RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE | [2013/02] |
Former [2001/35] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR MAGNETRESONANZGEFÜHRTE ELEKTROPHYSIOLOGIE- UND ABLATIONSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2001/35] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MAGNETIC-RESONANCE-GUIDED ELECTROPHYSIOLOGIC AND ABLATION PROCEDURES | ||
Former [2001/35] | SYSTEME ET TECHNIQUE PERMETTANT D'EXECUTER DES PROCEDURES D'ABLATION ET D'ELECTROPHYSIOLOGIE GUIDEES PAR RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2001 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.05.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 24.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11005214.9 / EP2371281 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.05.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.01.2013 | BE | 16.01.2013 | CY | 16.01.2013 | DK | 16.01.2013 | FI | 16.01.2013 | MC | 16.01.2013 | NL | 16.01.2013 | SE | 16.01.2013 | GR | 17.04.2013 | ES | 27.04.2013 | PT | 16.05.2013 | [2014/33] |
Former [2013/48] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 16.01.2013 | |
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 16.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5318025 (DUMOULIN CHARLES L [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,14-22,26 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 32; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5443489 (BEN-HAIM SHLOMO [IL]) [Y] 1,2,14-22,26 * column 10, line 3 - line 26; figure 5 *; | [A]US5323778 (KANDARPA KRISHNA [US], et al) [A] 1,3,14 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 32; figure 4 *; | [A]JPH0751247 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [A] 1,3,14 * column A * | International search | [Y]US5443489 (BEN-HAIM SHLOMO [IL]); | [Y]US5318025 (DUMOULIN CHARLES L [US], et al); | [YP]US5868674 (GLOWINSKI ARNDT [DE], et al) | by applicant | US5323778 | US5318025 |