EP1149385 - IC TEST SOFTWARE SYSTEM FOR MAPPING LOGICAL FUNCTIONAL TEST DATA OF LOGIC INTEGRATED CIRCUITS TO PHYSICAL REPRESENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SE | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FEI COMPANY 5350 NE Dawson Creek Drive Hillsboro, Or 97124 / US | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states FEI Company 5350 NE Dawson Creek Drive Hillsboro, Or 97124 / US | ||
For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way, Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | |||
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states Electroglas, Inc. 6024 Silver Creek Valley Road San Jose, CA 95138 / US | ||
For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way, Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | |||
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states KNIGHTS TECHNOLOGY, INC 155 North Wolf Road Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | ||
For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way, Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Shawn 2001 South Mopac, Apartment 2436 Austin, TX 75746 / US | 02 /
BALACHANDRAN, Hari 7432 Frankfort Road, Apartment 212 Dallas, TX 75252 / US | 03 /
PARKER, Jason 307 Pinyon Lane Coppell, TX 75019 / US | 04 /
WATTS BUTLER, Stephanie 4700 Winter Park Drive Richardson, TX 75082 / US | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | Lomas, Geoffrey Michael, et al Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | Lomas, Geoffrey Michael, et al Barker Brettell Medina Chambers, Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99958909.6 | 12.11.1999 | [2001/44] | WO1999US26735 | Priority number, date | US19980192164 | 13.11.1998 Original published format: US 192164 | [2001/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0030119 | Date: | 25.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1149385 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1149385 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.05.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G11C29/00, G01R31/28, G01R31/3183 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
G01R31/318307 (EP,US);
G01R31/2834 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/44] | G11C29/00, G01R31/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/44] | Title | German: | IC-TEST PROGRAMMIERSYSTEM ZUR ZUORDNUNG LOGISCHER FUNKTIONSTESTDATEN VON LOGISCHEN INTEGRIERTEN SCHALTUNG ZU EINER PHYSIKALISCHEN DARSTELLUNG | [2001/44] | English: | IC TEST SOFTWARE SYSTEM FOR MAPPING LOGICAL FUNCTIONAL TEST DATA OF LOGIC INTEGRATED CIRCUITS TO PHYSICAL REPRESENTATION | [2001/44] | French: | SYSTEME LOGICIEL D'ESSAI DE CIRCUIT INTEGRE DESTINE A FAIRE CORRESPONDRE DES DONNEES D'ESSAI FONCTIONNELLES LOGIQUES DE CIRCUITS INTEGRES LOGIQUES AVEC UNE REPRESENTATION PHYSIQUE | [2001/44] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2001 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 25.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.03.2005 | BE | 16.03.2005 | CH | 16.03.2005 | FI | 16.03.2005 | IT | 16.03.2005 | LI | 16.03.2005 | NL | 16.03.2005 | DK | 16.06.2005 | GR | 16.06.2005 | SE | 16.06.2005 | ES | 27.06.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | CY | 12.11.2005 | IE | 14.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
ES | 27.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
CY | 12.11.2005 | ||
IE | 14.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
ES | 27.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
IE | 14.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
ES | 27.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
ES | 27.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 16.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5475695 (CAYWOOD JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 2, line 37 - column 6, line 14; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5668745 (DAY CHRIS [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 18 - column 7, line 33; figures 2-5 *; | [A]US5771243 (LEE ROBERT G-H [TW], et al) [A] 1-9* column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 59; figures 1-3 * | International search | [Y]US4801869 (SPROGIS EDMUND J [US]); | [X]US5720031 (LINDSAY BRENT [US]); | [Y] - MCLEOD G R, "BUILT-IN SYSTEM TEST AND FAULT LOCATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL TEST CONFERENCE. WASHINGTON, OCT. 2 - 6, 1994., NEW YORK, IEEE., US, US, (19941001), ISBN 978-0-7803-2103-8, pages 291 - 299, XP002927255 | [X] - BURWICK W, DAUM W, "HIGH YIELD MULTICHIP MODULES BASED ON MINIMAL IC PRETEST", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL TEST CONFERENCE. WASHINGTON, OCT. 2 - 6, 1994., NEW YORK, IEEE., US, US, (19941001), ISBN 978-0-7803-2103-8, pages 30 - 40, XP002927256 | [Y] - YUE J, ET AL., "AN EFFECTIVE METHOD TO SCREEN SOI WAFERS FOR MASS PRODUCTION", INTERNATIONAL SOI CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. NANTUCKET ISLAND, OCT. 3 - 6, 1994., NEW YORK, IEEE., US, US, (19941001), doi:10.1109/SOI.1994.514272, ISBN 978-0-7803-2407-7, page 113/114, XP002927257 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SOI.1994.514272 | [Y] - MULLENIX P. ET AL., "Limited Yield Estimation fo Visual Defect Sources", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SEMICONDUCTOR MANUFACTURING,, (199702), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 17 - 23, XP002927258 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/66.554478 |