EP1146920 - BLOOD PUMP USING CROSS-FLOW PRINCIPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HeartWare, Inc. 3351 Executive Way Miramar, Florida 33025 / US | [2004/20] |
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states Kriton Medical, Inc. 6790 Florin-Perkins Road Sacramento, CA 95828-1812 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Long, Sheng 5325 Marconi Avenue Carmichael, CA 95608 / US | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Popp, Eugen Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/43] | Popp, Eugen, Dr. MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99958937.7 | 10.11.1999 | [2001/43] | WO1999US26838 | Priority number, date | US19990233567 | 19.01.1999 Original published format: US 233567 | [2001/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0043053 | Date: | 27.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1146920 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1146920 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/10, F04D17/04, F04D29/28 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
F04D13/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61M60/237 (EP,KR);
A61M60/13 (EP,KR);
A61M60/174 (EP,KR);
A61M60/178 (US);
A61M60/216 (US);
A61M60/405 (KR,US);
A61M60/414 (EP,KR,US);
A61M60/416 (EP,US);
A61M60/806 (EP,KR,US);
A61M60/812 (EP,KR,US);
A61M60/857 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLUTPUMPE UNTER ANWENDUNG DES QUERSTRÖMUNGSPRINZIPS | [2001/43] | English: | BLOOD PUMP USING CROSS-FLOW PRINCIPLES | [2001/43] | French: | POMPE A SANG UTILISANT UN ECOULEMENT CROISE | [2001/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/43] | 12.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2006 | BE | 14.06.2006 | CH | 14.06.2006 | CY | 14.06.2006 | FI | 14.06.2006 | IT | 14.06.2006 | LI | 14.06.2006 | DK | 14.09.2006 | SE | 14.09.2006 | GR | 15.09.2006 | ES | 25.09.2006 | IE | 10.11.2006 | LU | 10.11.2006 | PT | 14.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
IE | 10.11.2006 | ||
LU | 10.11.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
IE | 10.11.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
IE | 10.11.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/04] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 14.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5092844 (SCHWARTZ ROBERT S [US], et al) [A] 1,24,27 * the whole document *; | [A]US5611667 (NAGAMORI AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 8-12,14-18 * abstract * * figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [XA]US5685700 (IZRAELEV VALENTIN M [US]) [X] 1,27 * column 4, line 10 - line 67 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 24; | [A] - BUTLER ET AL., "DEVELOPMENT OF A 14 FR. SIZE HEMOPUMP", ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY, (19901101), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 735 - 736, XP000236245 |