EP1151283 - CYLINDRICAL OBJECT SURFACE INSPECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc. 3333 Old Milton Parkway Alpharetta, GA 30005 / US | [2006/28] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states Acuity Imaging LLC 9 Townsend West Nashua, NH 03063 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUDLOW, Jonathan 46 Lowell Street Lexington, MA 02172 / US | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | McLean, Robert Andreas, et al Dummett Copp LLP 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | McLean, Robert Andreas, et al Dummett Copp, 25 The Square, Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99959011.0 | 16.11.1999 | [2001/45] | WO1999US27164 | Priority number, date | US19980197077 | 20.11.1998 Original published format: US 197077 | [2001/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0031520 | Date: | 02.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1151283 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1151283 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.06.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/88, G01N21/952, A24C5/34, B07C5/342, B65B19/28 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
A24C5/3412 (EP,US);
G01N21/952 (EP,US);
Y10S131/905 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/45] | G01N21/88 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/07] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INSPEKTIONSSYSTEM FÜR DIE OBERFLÄCHE VON ZYLINDRISCHEN OBJEKTEM | [2001/45] | English: | CYLINDRICAL OBJECT SURFACE INSPECTION SYSTEM | [2001/45] | French: | SYSTEME D'INSPECTION DE SURFACE POUR OBJETS CYLINDRIQUES | [2001/45] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2001 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 15.06.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.05.2004 | 30.11.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   19.05.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.02.2006 | CH | 15.02.2006 | CY | 15.02.2006 | FI | 15.02.2006 | IT | 15.02.2006 | LI | 15.02.2006 | NL | 15.02.2006 | DK | 15.05.2006 | SE | 15.05.2006 | GR | 16.05.2006 | ES | 26.05.2006 | PT | 17.07.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
GR | 16.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 15.02.2006 | |
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 15.02.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4678901 (FOCKE HEINZ [DE], et al) [Y] 1,21,24,26 * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 4; figures 1-4 * [A] 7,16,27; | [YA]US4767924 (GIEBEL HAYO [DE], et al) [Y] 1,21,24,26 * column 5, line 35 - line 40 * * column 7, line 62 - column 8, line 68; figure 4 * [A] 6,7,27; | [A]US5228462 (OSMALOV JEROME S [US], et al) [A] 1,21,24,26 * column 4, line 6 - line 66; figure 1 *; | [A]US5365596 (DANTE HENRY M [US], et al) [A] 1,5,21,24,26 * column 1, line 56 - line 68 ** column 5, line 7 - line 56 *; | [YA]US5432600 (GROLLIMUND GARY [US], et al) [Y] 1,21,24,26 * column 4, line 4 - column 8, line 17; figures 1-4 * [A] 6-8,11,12,18 | International search | [Y]US5013905 (NERI ARMANDO [IT]); | [Y]US5109236 (WATANABE YOUICHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5404023 (NERI ARMANDO [IT], et al); | [Y]US5774177 (LANE JEFFERY SCOTT [US]) |