EP1214467 - PROCESS OF ROTARY KNITTING A TUBULAR BLANK WITH KNITTED POCKET ON MULTI-FEED CIRCULAR KNITTING MACHINE AND PRODUCTS FORMED BY THE PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sara Lee Corporation 1000 East Hanes Mill Road Winston-Salem, NC 27105 / US | [2002/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MYERS, Jonathan 459 N. Avalon Road Winston-Salem, NC 27104 / US | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | Farwell, William Robert, et al PHILLIPS & LEIGH 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | Farwell, William Robert, et al PHILLIPS & LEIGH 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99959048.2 | 19.11.1999 | [2002/25] | WO1999US27524 | Priority number, date | US19990388865 | 02.09.1999 Original published format: US 388865 | [2002/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0116415 | Date: | 08.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1214467 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D04B1/26 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
D04B1/26 (EP,US);
D04B1/108 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM RUNDSTRICKEN EINES SCHLAUCHFORMIGEN FORMSTüCKS MIT GESTRICKTEM BEUTEL AN EINER RUNDSTRICKMASCHINE MIT MEHREREN FADENLIEFERSYSTEMEN UND DAMIT ERHALTENE PRODUKTE | [2002/25] | English: | PROCESS OF ROTARY KNITTING A TUBULAR BLANK WITH KNITTED POCKET ON MULTI-FEED CIRCULAR KNITTING MACHINE AND PRODUCTS FORMED BY THE PROCESS | [2002/25] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRICOTAGE ROTATIF D'UNE EBAUCHE TUBULAIRE AVEC DES POCHES TRICOTEES SUR UN METIER CIRCULAIRE MULTICHUTES ET PRODUITS FORMES AVEC CE PROCEDE | [2002/25] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 11.06.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1585300 (REYMES COLE BERNARD THORNTON R); | [X]DE3303108 (ELITEX ZAVODY TEXTILNIHO [CS]) [X] 1-24 * page 6, line 11 - page 8, line 23; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3610410 (ELITEX ZAVODY TEXTILNIHO [CS]); | [A]DE3732945 (VARITEX GMBH [DE]) |