EP1062499 - X-RAY DEVICE. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN ES, Arthur, R. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/05] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Prof. Holstlaan 6, Building WAH 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2000/52] | Bakker, Hendrik, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 99959358.5 | 29.11.1999 | [2000/52] | WO1999EP09260 | Priority number, date | EP19980204239 | 14.12.1998 Original published format: EP 98204239 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0036403 | Date: | 22.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1062499 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1062499 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/04, A61B6/00 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
G01N23/20016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2000/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | RÖNTGENSTRAHLVORRICHTUNG | [2000/52] | English: | X-RAY DEVICE. | [2000/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF A RAYONS X | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 22.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 28.05.2008 | FR | 30.11.2008 | [2011/45] |
Former [2008/51] | NL | 28.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0717954 (OEC MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 29 - line 46 * * column 5, line 9 - line 20 * * column 5, line 30 - line 44 * * column 6, line 5 - line 15; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19639979 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 10 * * column 5, line 41 - line 57; figures 3,4 * |