EP1148115 - VISCOSITY MODIFIER FOR LUBRICATING OIL AND LUBRICATING OIL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states The Lubrizol Corporation 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, Ohio 44092 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states The Lubrizol Corporation 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, Ohio 44092 / US | |||
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6070 / JP | ||
For all designated states The Lubrizol Corporation 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, Ohio 44092 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Keiji Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 1-2, Waki 6-chome Waki-cho Kuga-gun Yamaguchi 740-0061 / JP | 02 /
KANESHIGE, Ryousuke Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 3, Chigusa-Kaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0108 / JP | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99959693.5 | 08.12.1999 | [2001/43] | WO1999JP06868 | Priority number, date | JP19980350279 | 09.12.1998 Original published format: JP 35027998 | JP19980350280 | 09.12.1998 Original published format: JP 35028098 | [2001/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0034420 | Date: | 15.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1148115 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1148115 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.06.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C10M143/04, C10M157/00, C10M171/00, C08F210/16, // (C10M143/04, 143:02),(C10M157/00, 143:04, 143:02, 145:14),(C10N40/04, 30:02) | [2002/22] | CPC: |
C10M177/00 (EP,US);
C10M119/02 (KR);
C10M143/02 (EP,US);
C10M143/04 (EP,US);
C10M157/00 (EP,US);
C10M171/00 (EP,US);
C10M2205/00 (EP,US);
C10M2205/022 (EP,US);
C10M2205/024 (EP,US);
C10N2020/01 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/43] | C10M143/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/25] |
Former [2001/43] | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | VIKOSITÄTSVERÄNDERER FÜR SCHMIERÖLE UND SCHMIERÖLZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2001/43] | English: | VISCOSITY MODIFIER FOR LUBRICATING OIL AND LUBRICATING OIL COMPOSITION | [2001/43] | French: | MODIFICATEUR DE VISCOSITE POUR HUILE LUBRIFIANTE ET COMPOSITION D'HUILE LUBRIFIANTE | [2001/43] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2001 | Translation filed | 09.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2001 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/43] | 31.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.06.2005 | BE | 29.06.2005 | CH | 29.06.2005 | FI | 29.06.2005 | LI | 29.06.2005 | DK | 29.09.2005 | GR | 29.09.2005 | SE | 29.09.2005 | ES | 10.10.2005 | PT | 29.11.2005 | CY | 08.12.2005 | IE | 08.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
CY | 08.12.2005 | ||
IE | 08.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
IE | 08.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 29.06.2005 | |
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 29.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4146492 (CUSANO CARMEN M, et al) [A] 1-9* column W *; | [XY]EP0299608 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1,4,7 * page 13, line 25 - line 51; example - * * page 19, line 41 - line 47 * * page 20, line 22 - page 21, line 18 * [Y] 8; | [XY]EP0385729 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1,4,7 * page 3, line 35 - page 4, line 29 * * page 13, line 47 - page 14, line 15 * * examples A,15-18; claim 1 * [Y] 8; | [X]US4959436 (COZEWITH CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 20, line 29 - column 22, line 28; example - *; | [X]EP0422859 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1,4,7 * page 6, line 54 - page 12, line 55; example - *; | [X]US5094766 (KAPUSCINSKI MARIA M [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 4, line 65 - column 6, line 9 *; | [A]US5218071 (TSUTSUI TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 5, line 35 - column 9, line 3 * * column 20, line 58 - column 21, line 15; example - *; | [XY]EP0638611 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * example II * [Y] 8 | International search | [A]EP0129414 ; | [A]EP0200351 ; | [A]EP0638611 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]) |