EP1143209 - REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2018/07] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOMYO, Nobuo, @Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1304, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | 02 /
KITA, Koichi, @Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1304, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | [2018/07] |
Former [2001/41] | 01 /
DOMYO, Nobuo, Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant Daikin Industries, Ltd., 1304, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | ||
02 /
KITA, Koichi, Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant Daikin Industries, Ltd., 1304, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K., et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [2018/07] |
Former [2001/41] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99959821.2 | 15.12.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999JP07036 | Priority number, date | JP19980357691 | 16.12.1998 Original published format: JP 35769198 | [2001/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0036347 | Date: | 22.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1143209 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1143209 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.06.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F25B13/00, F25B41/04, F25B41/06 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
F25B13/00 (EP,US);
F25B41/20 (EP,US);
F25B41/24 (EP,US);
F25B41/34 (EP,US);
F25B2313/0272 (EP,US);
F25B2313/02741 (EP,US);
F25B2400/12 (EP,US);
F25B2400/16 (EP);
F25B2400/19 (EP,US);
F25B2400/23 (EP,US);
F25B2500/22 (EP,US);
F25B2500/221 (EP,US);
F25B2500/27 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2513 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2523 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/41] | F25B13/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2018/07] |
Former [2004/22] | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KÄLTEVORRICHTUNG | [2001/41] | English: | REFRIGERATOR | [2001/41] | French: | RÉFRIGÉRATEUR | [2017/30] |
Former [2001/41] | REFRIGERATEUR | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2001 | Translation filed | 28.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2001 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 18.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10004887.5 / EP2228612 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPH0914782 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [I] 1-18* abstract * | International search | [A]JPS6160066U ; | [A]JPH05118720 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPH05332625 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]JPH06257826 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH0914782 (DAIKIN IND LTD) | Examination | US5524449 | by applicant | JPH05118720 |