EP1095290 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPLEMENTING AUTOMATIC TILT CONTROL OF A RADAR ANTENNA ON AN AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONNER, Kevin, J. 729 Alvord Avenue North Kent, WA 98031-3122 / US | 02 /
MORICI, Martin, M. 10 Hollis Court Timonium, MD 21093 / US | 03 /
KUNTMAN, Daryal 4645 175th Avenue S.E. Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | 04 /
HAMMACK, Stephen, D. 6511 206th Place N.E. Redmond, WA 98053 / US | 05 /
JOYCE, Jim 1374 East Meadow Lane Olathe, KS 66062 / US | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2001/48] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2001/18] | Sturm, Christoph Honeywell Holding AG, Rechts- und Patentabteilung, Kaiserleistrasse 39 63067 Offenbach am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 99960695.7 | 06.07.1999 | [2001/18] | WO1999US15333 | Priority number, date | US19980092025P | 06.07.1998 Original published format: US 92025 P | US19980111957P | 11.12.1998 Original published format: US 111957 P | US19990118220P | 01.02.1999 Original published format: US 118220 P | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0003263 | Date: | 20.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1095290 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1095290 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/95, H01Q1/28, H01Q3/26, G01S7/28, G01S13/93 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
G01S13/953 (EP,US);
G01S13/933 (EP,US);
G01S7/2813 (EP,US);
H01Q1/28 (EP,US);
H01Q3/26 (EP,US);
G01S13/882 (EP,US);
Y02A90/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/18] | G01S1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/39] |
Former [2001/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DER AUTOMATISCHEN NEIGUNGSSTEUERUNG EINER RADARANTENNE IN EINEM FLUGZEUG | [2004/39] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPLEMENTING AUTOMATIC TILT CONTROL OF A RADAR ANTENNA ON AN AIRCRAFT | [2001/18] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE UN SELECTEUR DE SITE AUTOMATIQUE D'UNE ANTENNE RADAR EMBARQUEE SUR UN AERONEF | [2001/18] |
Former [2001/18] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DER AUTOMATISCHEN NEIGUNGSSTEUERUNG EINER RADARANTENNE IN EIMEM FLUGZEUG | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 06.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03075746.2 / EP1329738 | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3885237 (KIRKPATRICK GEORGE M) [X] 11 * abstract * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 27 * [A] 1,2,7-10,12,16,18,19; | [A]US5198819 (SUSNJARA KENNETH J [US]) [A] 1,2,7-12,16,18,19 * abstract ** column 3, line 49 - line 64 *; | [A]US5392048 (MICHIE TERRY K) [A] 1,2,7-12,16,18,19 * abstract * * column 5, line 17 - line 33 *; | [XA]US5485156 (MANSEUR AREZKI [US], et al) [X] 11 * abstract * * column 4, line 51 - line 57 * [A] 1,2,7-10,12,16,18,19; | [A]WO9807047 (IMAGING ACCESSORIES INC [US]) [A] 1,2,7-12,16,18,19 * abstract * * page 3, line 5 - line 15 * * page 17, line 33 - page 18, line 12 * * page 18, line 37 - page 19, line 2 * * page 19, line 13 - line 27 * |