EP1133796 - A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A TWO-DIMENSIONAL SUPPORT FOR SEMICONDUCTOR CHIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/38] | TWO-DIMENSIONAL SUPPORT FOR SEMICONDUCTOR CHIPS, AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH A TWO-DIMENSIONAL SUPPORT | ||
[2010/01] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KSW Microtec AG Manfred-von-Ardenne-Ring 12 01099 Dresden / DE | [2003/02] |
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states KSW Microtec Gesellschaft für Angewandte Mikrotechnik mbH Dresden Gostritzer Strasse 63 01217 Dresden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEIDOWSKI, Thomas Ockerwitzer Strasse 6 D-01157 Dresden / DE | 02 /
KRIEBEL, Frank Hauptstrasse 68 D-01896 Lichtenberg / DE | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Adler, Peter, et al Lippert, Stachow & Partner Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Adler, Peter, et al Lippert, Stachow & Partner Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2004/31] | Heyner, Klaus, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Heyner & Dr. Sperling, Niederwaldstrasse 27 01277 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2004/17] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2001/38] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Gostritzer Strasse 61-63 01217 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 99960780.7 | 12.10.1999 | [2001/38] | WO1999DE03322 | Priority number, date | DE1998147088 | 13.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19847088 | [2001/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0022673 | Date: | 20.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1133796 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1133796 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/41] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1133796 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/498, G06K19/077 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
G06K19/07779 (EP);
G06K19/07749 (EP);
G06K19/07783 (EP);
G06K19/08 (EP);
H01L23/49855 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP);
H05K1/095 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FLAECHIG AUSGEBILDETEN TRAEGERS FUER HALBLEITER- CHIPS | [2010/01] | English: | A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A TWO-DIMENSIONAL SUPPORT FOR SEMICONDUCTOR CHIPS | [2010/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN SUPPORT PLAN POUR MICROPLAQUETTE SEMI-CONDUCTRICE | [2010/01] |
Former [2001/38] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG SOWIE EIN FLÄCHIG AUSGEBILDETER TRÄGER FÜR HALBLEITER-CHIPS | ||
Former [2001/38] | TWO-DIMENSIONAL SUPPORT FOR SEMICONDUCTOR CHIPS, AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH A TWO-DIMENSIONAL SUPPORT | ||
Former [2001/38] | SUPPORT PLAN POUR MICROPLAQUETTE SEMI-CONDUCTRICE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.07.2006
20.07.2006
ADMISSIBLE Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Höhfeld, Jochen Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.07.2006
20.07.2006
ADMISSIBLE Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Höhfeld, Jochen Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.07.2006
20.07.2006
ADMISSIBLE Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Niedermeier, Peter Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | 23.08.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.10.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.10.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.10.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.09.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.09.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 10.03.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 30.11.2007 | Appeal received No. T0149/08 | 12.02.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.09.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 29.09.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.10.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.10.2005 | IE | 12.10.2005 | BE | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | LU | 12.12.2005 | DK | 12.01.2006 | GR | 12.01.2006 | SE | 12.01.2006 | ES | 23.01.2006 | PT | 13.03.2006 | [2008/22] |
Former [2007/31] | CY | 12.10.2005 | |
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
BE | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
LU | 12.12.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
FR | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | CY | 12.10.2005 | |
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
BE | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
LU | 12.12.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | IE | 12.10.2005 | |
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | IE | 12.10.2005 | |
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | MC | 31.10.2005 | |
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | MC | 31.10.2005 | |
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/30] | MC | 31.10.2005 | |
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | SE | 12.01.2006 | |
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | PT | 13.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0682369 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 25* figures 5,6 *; | [XY]EP0824301 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8,11,18,21,26-28 * column 9, line 32 - line 36 * * column 10, line 9 - column 11, line 28; figures 5,7 * [Y] 9,10; | [DY]DE19642378 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [DY] 9,10 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 20; figure - *; | [A]FR2756955 (SCHLUMBERGER IND SA [FR]) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0855675 (IBM [US]) [A] 13,14,17,19,20 * figures 2,4,5,8-13 * |