EP1037789 - SHOPPING CART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WANZL METALLWARENFABRIK GMBH Postfach 1129 D-89336 Leipheim / DE | [2000/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECKERT, Rainer Werterbachstrasse 14 D-73230 Kirchheim/Teck / DE | 02 /
MAATZ, Bernhard Friedrich-List-Strasse 3 D-86153 Augsburg / DE | [2000/39] | Application number, filing date | 99960788.0 | 14.10.1999 | [2000/39] | WO1999DE03335 | Priority number, date | DE1998148198 | 20.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19848198 | DE1999129135 | 25.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19929135 | [2000/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0023311 | Date: | 27.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1037789 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1037789 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62B3/14 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
B62B3/142 (EP);
B62B3/1408 (EP);
B62B3/144 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2002/51] |
Former [2000/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | EINKAUFSWAGEN | [2000/39] | English: | SHOPPING CART | [2000/39] | French: | CHARIOT | [2000/39] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 12.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.12.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 18.12.2002 | SE | 18.03.2003 | ES | 27.06.2003 | [2008/18] |
Former [2004/05] | SE | 18.03.2003 | |
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 18.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [XDA]US3782747 (HAMILTON O) [XD] 1,4,5 * abstract * [A] 2,3,6-9; | [A]US4773175 (LARSEN CLIFFORD A [US]) [A] 1,5-7,9 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO9950564 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [PA] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3133276 (DANIEL KLAUS JUERGEN) [A] 1,5,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4761904 (FAST JACOB [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5 * the whole document * |