EP1144875 - DETACHABLE ASSEMBLY OF TWO ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2007 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Niklaus, Hilmar Lindenweg 2 97654 Bastheim / DE | [2001/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Pöhner, Wilfried Anton Pöhner Scharfenberger & Partner Kaiserstrasse 33 Postfach 6323 97013 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Pöhner, Wilfried Anton, Dr. Patentanwalt Postfach 6323 97070 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99960789.8 | 14.10.1999 | [2001/42] | WO1999DE03336 | Priority number, date | DE19981057795 | 15.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19857795 | [2001/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0036308 | Date: | 22.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1144875 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1144875 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/37] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1144875 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16B12/20 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
F16B12/2009 (EP,US);
Y10S403/08 (EP,US);
Y10S403/12 (EP,US);
Y10T403/57 (EP,US);
Y10T403/5713 (EP,US);
Y10T403/66 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Extension states | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | SI | 16.07.2001 | Title | German: | LÖSBARE VERBINDUNG ZWEIER ELEMENTE | [2001/42] | English: | DETACHABLE ASSEMBLY OF TWO ELEMENTS | [2001/42] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE LIBERABLE DE DEUX ELEMENTS | [2001/42] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 14.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.06.2003
04.07.2003
ADMISSIBLE Hettich-Heinze GmbH & Co.KG Industriestrasse 83-87 32139 Spenge / DE Opponent's representative Specht, Peter Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.06.2003
Hettich-Heinze GmbH & Co.KG Industriestrasse 83-87 32139 Spenge / DE Opponent's representative Specht, Peter, Dipl.-Phys. Loesenbeck.Stracke.Specht.Dantz, Patentanwälte, Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | 25.07.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.02.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 12.02.2007 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.02.2007 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.09.2007 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 11.09.2002 | IE | 14.10.2002 | CY | 31.10.2002 | PT | 24.01.2003 | ES | 28.03.2003 | MC | 01.05.2003 | [2006/44] |
Former [2004/10] | GR | 11.09.2002 | |
IE | 14.10.2002 | ||
CY | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 24.01.2003 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | GR | 11.09.2002 | |
IE | 14.10.2002 | ||
PT | 24.01.2003 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | GR | 11.09.2002 | |
IE | 14.10.2002 | ||
PT | 24.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | GR | 11.09.2002 | |
PT | 24.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 11.09.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1811743 (BAROVERO & C S A S IND MOBILI) [A] 1,2,5-7,15-17* the whole document *; | [X]US5119610 (BIRKELAND KIRSTEN [ES], et al) [X] 1-7,12,13,15-17 * column 6, line 9 - column 7, line 8 * * figures 3-5 *; | [X]WO9732140 (STICH FRIEDRICH [AT], et al) [X] 1-7,12,13,15-17 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 4, line 1 - page 11, line 17 * * figures 1-12 * | Opposition | US4599011 | US4783189 |